Jalinski Advisory Group, Inc. v. JBL Financial Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jalinski Advisory Group, Inc.
Defendant: JBL Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv01914
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant JBL Financial Services, Inc. , filed by Jalinski Advisory Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Class 41 Certificate of Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Class 36 Certificates of Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Class 35 Certificate of Registration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Class 9 Certificate of Registration)(Williamson, Nick)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendant JBL Financial Services, Inc., Plaintiff Jalinski Advisory Group, Inc.. (CLO)
August 9, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant JBL Financial Services, Inc. to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, 30-Day Extension by Defendant JBL Financial Services, Inc.. ( Response to Court due by 9/3/2019.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/2/19. (KKS)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, 30-Day Extension by Defendant JBL Financial Services, Inc.. (Howard, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by David Lloyd Howard for Defendant JBL Financial Services, Inc.. (Howard, David)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jalinski Advisory Group, Inc.. JBL Financial Services, Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Williamson, Nick)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 11, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Nick E. Williamson. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding trademark. (Re-docketed for electronic filing purposes) (MFG)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark: by Plaintiff Jalinski Advisory Group, Inc. (Williamson, Nick)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Jalinski Advisory Group, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Williamson, Nick)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Jalinski Advisory Group, Inc. Process Server: Dave Condor (Williamson, Nick)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant JBL Financial Services, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7323236, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Jalinski Advisory Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Class 41 Certificate of Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Class 36 Certificates of Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Class 35 Certificate of Registration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Class 9 Certificate of Registration, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Summons)(Williamson, Nick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jalinski Advisory Group, Inc. v. JBL Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBL Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: David Lloyd Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jalinski Advisory Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nick E. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?