Taylor v. Anderson
Plaintiff: Rissa E Taylor and Rissa E. Taylor
Defendant: Christopher Anderson
Case Number: 4:2019cv01924
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2; Motion to Join Parties due by 10/30/2019. Discovery Completion due by 6/15/2020. ADR Future Reference 2/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2020. Jury Trial set for 1/25/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2021 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/27/19. (KKS)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED by agreement of the parties that the Rule 16 Conference scheduled for September 6, 2019 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/22/19. (JAB)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Rissa E. Taylor. . (Strellis, Jack)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Scheduling Conference: The Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is set for Friday, September 6, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in the chambers of the undersigned. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 8/30/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/6/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge John A. Ross.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/9/2019. (CLO)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas Anthony Cammarata for Defendant Christopher Anderson. (Cammarata, Nicholas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Christopher Anderson.(Cammarata, Nicholas)
July 12, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 1. Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (JWD)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Christopher Anderson with receipt number AMOEDC-7326740, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Rissa E Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Original Filing Form original filing form, #3 Waiver of Service Notice of Lawsuit, #4 Waiver of Service Waiver of Service of Summons)(Strellis, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rissa E Taylor
Represented By: Jack A. Strellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rissa E. Taylor
Represented By: Jack A. Strellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Anderson
Represented By: Nicholas Anthony Cammarata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?