Chubb National Insurance Company v. Sonesta International Hotels Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Chubb National Insurance Company
Defendant: Sonesta International Hotels Corporation and David Kohlasch
Case Number: 4:2019cv01934
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Chubb National Insurance Company. David Kohlasch served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (Konzelmann, Christopher)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Chubb National Insurance Company. Sonesta International Hotels Corporation served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (Konzelmann, Christopher)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Chubb National Insurance Company. Parent companies: Chubb Limited, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Konzelmann, Christopher)
August 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant David Kohlasch, Sonesta International Hotels Corporation. The summons were emailed to konzelmannc@whiteandwilliams.com. (KKS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Chubb National Insurance Company Process Server: We Serve Law LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons DAVID KOHLASCH, #2 Summons SONESTA INTERNATIONAL HOTELS CORPORATION)(Konzelmann, Christopher)
August 7, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Chubb National Insurance Company to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Chris Konzelmann. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7369284) by Plaintiff Chubb National Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Chris Konzelmann - New Jersey)(Konzelmann, Christopher) filed by Chubb National Insurance Company ; ORDERED GRANTED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 08/02/2019. (SMB)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Chris Konzelmann. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7369284) by Plaintiff Chubb National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Chris Konzelmann - New Jersey)(Konzelmann, Christopher)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 16, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (MFG)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant David Kohlasch, Sonesta International Hotels Corporation with receipt number AMOEDC-7330388, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Chubb National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Original Filing Form original filing form)(Koehler, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chubb National Insurance Company v. Sonesta International Hotels Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonesta International Hotels Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kohlasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chubb National Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew G. Koehler
Represented By: Christopher Konzelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?