Michael Jaudes Fitness Edge, Inc. v. The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC
Plaintiff: The Fitness Edge, Inc. and Michael Jaudes Fitness Edge, Inc.
Defendant: The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv01987
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED. ECF No. #5 . The Court has scheduled a Rule 16 conference by separate order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/6/19. (EAB)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/20/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/5/19. (EAB)
September 4, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig: Motion Hearing held on 9/4/2019 re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC. Arguments of counsel heard. Court denied the motion for temporary restraining order. Order to follow. (Court Reporter:Patti Dunn Wecke, Patti_Dunn_Wecke@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7984) (proceedings started: 9:06) (proceedings ended: 12:15)(Deputy Clerk: M. Berg)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Brian McGovern, Peter Corsale and Alex Lindley)(Appearance for Defendant: Rudolph Telsher, Lynn Rzonca and Mark Privratsky) (MCB)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Protective Order regarding confidential information. (See Protective Order for complete details) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on August 29, 2019. (MCB)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Docket Text ORDER Re: #19 MOTION to Seal Document #18 Sealed Document, #16 Memorandum in Opposition of Sealed Motion by Defendant The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/29/2019. (AFC)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER Re: #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Iuniki Louise Ikahihifo-Bender by Defendant The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC., #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark R. Privratsky by Defendant The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC., #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lynn E. Rzonca by Defendant The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/29/2019. (AFC)
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter Corsale for Plaintiff Michael Jaudes Fitness Edge, Inc.. (Corsale, Peter)
August 23, 2019 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC. Parent companies: NEP Edge Holdco, LLC, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Telscher, Rudolph)
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Seal Document #18 Sealed Document, #16 Memorandum in Opposition of Sealed Motion by Defendant The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Telscher, Rudolph)
August 23, 2019 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT re #16 Memorandum in Opposition of Sealed Motion Exhibit A Declaration of Peter Kushel by Defendant The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC. (Telscher, Rudolph)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENTAL re #16 Memorandum in Opposition of Sealed Motion by Defendant The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Telscher, Rudolph)
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition of Sealed Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC. (Telscher, Rudolph) (Per attorney document was served to other counsel via email on 8/23/19) (EAB).
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lynn E. Rzonca. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 4644082075) by Defendant The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC. (AFC)
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Iuniki Louise Ikahihifo-Bender. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 4644082076) by Defendant The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC. (AFC)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark R. Privratsky. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 4644082077) by Defendant The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC. (AFC)
August 22, 2019 Receipt 4644082077 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Ballard Spahr LLP. (JWD)
August 22, 2019 Receipt 4644082076 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Ballard Spahr LLP. (JWD)
August 22, 2019 Receipt 4644082075 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Ballard Spahr LLP (CCAM)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Protective Order)(Telscher, Rudolph)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr for Defendant The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC. (Telscher, Rudolph)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER Re #9 Joint MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff The Fitness Edge, Inc.. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on August 20, 2019. (MCB)
August 20, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff The Fitness Edge, Inc.. (McGovern, Brian)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiff's motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #5 ) will be held on Wednesday, September 4, 2019, at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 12S of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri, 111 South 10th Street, St. Louis, Missouri 63102. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for a Temporary Restraining Order shall be due no later than August 23, 2019. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/14/19. (KXS)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE Hearing: by Plaintiff The Fitness Edge, Inc. re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion (McGovern, Brian)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff The Fitness Edge, Inc.. (McGovern, Brian)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff The Fitness Edge, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McGovern, Brian)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant The Fitness Edge, Inc. , filed by The Fitness Edge, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(McGovern, Brian)
July 16, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Brian E. McGovern. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. (BAK)
July 16, 2019 ***REMARK - The Complaint is titled Plaintiff's Verified Complaint For Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary And Permanent Injunction, Accounting And Damages. Attorney has been contacted and instructed to separately file the "Motion For Temporary Restraining Order" and the "Notice Requesting Hearing On Motion For Temporary Restraining Order, as required by the Administrative Procedures For Case Management/Electronic Case Filing II.C. Complaint and the Motion For Temporary Restraining Order Checklist. The Clerk's Office has been instructed to proceed with the judge assignment and case processing procedures. (MRC)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff The Fitness Edge, Inc. Process Server: John Houseman (BAK)
July 15, 2019 Receipt: $ 400.00, receipt number AMOEDC-7333133 for Civil Filing Fee. (BAK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff The Fitness Edge, Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (McGovern, Brian)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Brian Edward The Fitness Edge, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet , #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Summons , #5 Form Notice of Intent to Use Process Server)(McGovern, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael Jaudes Fitness Edge, Inc. v. The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Fitness Edge, Inc.
Represented By: Brian E. McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jaudes Fitness Edge, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Corsale
Represented By: Brian E. McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Edge Fitness Clubs, LLC
Represented By: Iuniki Louise Ikahihifo-Bender
Represented By: Lynn E. Rzonca
Represented By: Mark R. Privratsky
Represented By: Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?