Robison v. Lawson et al
Plaintiff: Dwayne Robison
Defendant: Jeff Norman, Anne L. Precythe and Terri Lawson
Case Number: 4:2019cv02013
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John M Bodenhausen
Referring Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to the Clerk of Court from plaintiff requesting copies of docket sheets (copies mailed on 8/13/19) (KXS)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Tue Aug 6 09:47:35 CDT 2019 (Shepard, Alicia)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Jean C. Hamilton for all further proceedings (KXS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 16, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Jul 16 13:01:33 CDT 2019 (admin,)
July 16, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
July 16, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. (JWD)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Dwayne Robison. (JWD)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Dwayne Robison. (JWD)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Dwayne Robison. (JWD)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Terri Lawson, Jeff Norman, Anne L. Precythe, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Dwayne Robison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Mail Not Received, #2 Exhibit Grievance Forms, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robison v. Lawson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne L. Precythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Lawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Robison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?