Blakeney v. City of Pine Lawn, Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Steve P Blakeney and Steve Blakeney
Defendant: Missouri Public Entity Risk Management Fund, Paul Rinck, Smith And Associates, LLC, Anthony Gray, Brian Krueger, Lashawm Colquit, City of Pine Lawn, Missouri, Donnell Smith, Clarence Harmon, Willie Epps, John Struckhoff, Sylvester L Caldwell, Sylvester Caldwell and Lashawm Colquitt
Case Number: 4:2019cv02017
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #40 MOTION to Dismiss Party City of Pine Lawn filed by Defendant City of Pine Lawn, Missouri. (Hill, Blake)
September 13, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Party City of Pine Lawn by Defendant City of Pine Lawn, Missouri. (Hill, Blake)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Sylvester Caldwell. (Brett, Joel) filed by Sylvester Caldwell; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 09/06/19. (CMH)
September 5, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Sylvester Caldwell. (Brett, Joel)
September 3, 2019 Filing 37 ENTRY of Appearance by Kimberly J.Z. Guthrie for Defendant Missouri Public Entity Risk Management Fund. (Guthrie, Kimberly)
August 27, 2019 Filing 36 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Steve Blakeney as to Sylvester Caldwell. (Daugherty, John)
August 27, 2019 Filing 35 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Steve Blakeney as to Brian Krueger. (Daugherty, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 34 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr for all further proceedings. (KCB)
August 19, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Steve Blakeney, Defendants Sylvester Caldwell, City of Pine Lawn, Missouri, Lashawm Colquitt, Willie Epps, Anthony Gray, Clarence Harmon, Brian Krueger, Missouri Public Entity Risk Management Fund, Paul Rinck, Donnell Smith, John Struckhoff to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/26/2019.) (TMT)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Lashawm Colquitt, Willie Epps, Clarence Harmon, Paul Rinck, and John Struckhoff's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #19 ) is GRANTED, in part and DENIED, in part. Defendants Lashawm Colquitt, Willie Epps, Clarence Harmon, Paul Rinck, and John Struckhoff shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 20, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 08/19/2019. (KBL)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Doc. #28 ) filed by Jack Daugherty, counsel for Steven Blakeney, is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Jack Daugherty shall be admitted for the purpose of representing Plaintiff Steven Blakeney in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 8/19/2019. (KBL)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant City of Pine Lawn, Missouri's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond (Doc. #27 ) is GRANTED. Defendant City of Pine Lawn, Missouri shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 8/19/2019. (KBL)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Anthony Gray, Brian Krueger, and Donnell Smith's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading (Doc. #25 ) is GRANTED. Defendants Anthony Gray, Brian Krueger, and Donnell Smith shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 8/19/2019. (KBL)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Missouri Public Entity Risk Management Fund's Motion for Extension of Time in which to File an Answer (Doc. #20 ) is GRANTED. Missouri Public Entity Risk Management Fund shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before September 19, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 8/19/2019. (KBL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 28 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice jack Daugherty. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7397402) by Plaintiff Steve Blakeney. (Daugherty, John)
August 14, 2019 Filing 27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant City of Pine Lawn, Missouri. (Hill, Blake)
August 14, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Steve Blakeney. Paul Rinck served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (Short, Darren)
August 9, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Anthony Gray, Brian Krueger, Donnell Smith. (Rudolph, Timothy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy William Rudolph for Defendants Anthony Gray, Brian Krueger, Donnell Smith. (Rudolph, Timothy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy J. Reichardt for Defendants Anthony Gray, Brian Krueger, Donnell Smith. (Reichardt, Timothy)
August 7, 2019 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Joel D. Brett for Defendant Sylvester Caldwell. (Brett, Joel)
August 6, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael G. Berry for Defendant Missouri Public Entity Risk Management Fund. (Berry, Michael)
August 5, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Missouri Public Entity Risk Management Fund. (Berry, Michael)
August 5, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendants Lashawm Colquitt, Willie Epps, Clarence Harmon, Paul Rinck, John Struckhoff. (Kayser, Portia)
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Blake Daniel Hill for Defendant City of Pine Lawn, Missouri. (Hill, Blake)
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Jasmine Yasar McCormick for Defendants Lashawm Colquitt, Willie Epps, Clarence Harmon, Paul Rinck, John Struckhoff. (McCormick, Jasmine)
August 2, 2019 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Portia Celeste Kayser for Defendants Lashawm Colquitt, Willie Epps, Clarence Harmon, Paul Rinck, John Struckhoff. (Kayser, Portia)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Steve Blakeney. (Short, Darren)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Steve Blakeney. Missouri Public Entity Risk Management Fund served on 7/30/2019, answer due 8/20/2019. (Short, Darren) Modified on 8/6/2019 (TMT).
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Steve Blakeney. Clarence Harmon served on 7/27/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Short, Darren)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Steve Blakeney. Anthony Gray served on 7/27/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Short, Darren)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Steve Blakeney. Clarence Harmon served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Short, Darren) [Document filed in error; see document number #13 ] Modified on 8/2/2019 (TMT).
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Steve Blakeney. City of Pine Lawn, Missouri served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Short, Darren)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Steve Blakeney. John Struckhoff served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Short, Darren)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Steve Blakeney. Lashawm Colquitt served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Short, Darren)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Steve Blakeney. Willie Epps served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Short, Darren)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Steve Blakeney. Donnell Smith served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Short, Darren)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Steve Blakeney. Smith And Associates, LLC served on 7/24/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (Short, Darren)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 17, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 12 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Darren K. Short. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Steve Blakeney Process Server: A Closer Look Investigations (Attachments: #1 Summons Kruger Summons, #2 Summons Gray Summons, #3 Summons Struckhoff Summons, #4 Summons Colquitt Summons, #5 Summons Harmon Summons, #6 Summons Pine Lawn Summons, #7 Summons Caldwell Summons, #8 Summons Smith Summons, #9 Summons Epps Summons, #10 Summons MOPERM Summons, #11 Summons Smith and Associates Summons, #12 Summons Rinck Summons)(Short, Darren)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J. Brunton for Plaintiff Steve P Blakeney. (Brunton, Michael)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7336571, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Steve P Blakeney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35)(Short, Darren) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2019: #37 Original Filing Form) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blakeney v. City of Pine Lawn, Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Public Entity Risk Management Fund
Represented By: Michael G. Berry
Represented By: Kimberly J.Z. Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Rinck
Represented By: Portia Celeste Kayser
Represented By: Jasmine Yasar McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith And Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Gray
Represented By: Timothy William Rudolph
Represented By: Timothy J. Reichardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Krueger
Represented By: Timothy William Rudolph
Represented By: Timothy J. Reichardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lashawm Colquit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Pine Lawn, Missouri
Represented By: Blake Daniel Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnell Smith
Represented By: Timothy William Rudolph
Represented By: Timothy J. Reichardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Harmon
Represented By: Portia Celeste Kayser
Represented By: Jasmine Yasar McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Epps
Represented By: Portia Celeste Kayser
Represented By: Jasmine Yasar McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Struckhoff
Represented By: Portia Celeste Kayser
Represented By: Jasmine Yasar McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvester L Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvester Caldwell
Represented By: Joel D. Brett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lashawm Colquitt
Represented By: Portia Celeste Kayser
Represented By: Jasmine Yasar McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve P Blakeney
Represented By: Darren K. Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Blakeney
Represented By: Darren K. Short
Represented By: Michael J. Brunton
Represented By: John R. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?