Cole v. Challenge MFG. Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Charmaine Cole
Defendant: Challenge MFG. Company, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02022
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Referring Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply: 1. Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, is set for Thursday, October 3, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. in the chambers of Judge Stephen R. Clark. Lead trial counsel must appear for the conference in-person. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Joint Scheduling Plan due by 9/23/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/3/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Stephen R. Clark. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/9/19. (JAB)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Challenge MFG. Company, LLC.(Witcher, R.)
July 17, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Charmaine Cole.(MFG)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Challenge Manufacturing Company, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Witcher, R.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Challenge Manufacturing Company, LLC. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Witcher, R.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Challenge Manufacturing Company, LLC NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal Petition)(Witcher, R.)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Mallory Stumpf Zoia for Defendant Challenge Manufacturing Company, LLC. (Zoia, Mallory)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 19SL-CC02287, with receipt number AMOEDC-7338304, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Challenge Manufacturing Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Attachment State Court file)(Witcher, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Challenge MFG. Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Challenge MFG. Company, LLC
Represented By: Mallory Stumpf Zoia
Represented By: R. Lance Witcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmaine Cole
Represented By: Richard J. Magee, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?