St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council et al v. CCR Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Gaal, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Dan Barger, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Rocky Kloth, Dan Neiswander, Dennis Joyce, Donald Brussel, Jr., Robert Behlman, Craig McPartlin, Todd Hake, Greg Hesser, James Carson, Mike Hart, Kevin Deptula, Tim Wies, Kent Kiefner, Mike Weis, Albert Bond, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Tod O'Donaghue, Tim Schoolfield, Keith Taylor, Mark Boehms, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council and Jim Sauer
Defendant: CCR Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02025
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss [Doc. #5 ] is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), with each party to bear its own costs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 08/20/2019. (AAS)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Mike Weis, Tim Wies. (Campbell, Greg)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis), Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mike Weis, Rocky Kloth, Scott Byrne, Tod O'Donaghue, Donald Brussel, Jr, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Robert Calhoun, Keith Taylor, Dan Barger, James Carson, Todd Hake, Tim Schoolfield, Mike Hart, Kevin Deptula, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Dennis Joyce, John Gaal, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis), Kent Kiefner, Tim Wies, Dan Neiswander, Mark Boehms, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Albert Bond, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Jim Sauer, Craig McPartlin, Robert Behlman, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis). CCR Construction, Inc. served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Campbell, Greg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 17, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Greg A. Campbell. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Jr. Brussel, Donald Jr. Brussel, Donald Jr. Brussel, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, James Carson, James Carson, James Carson, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Mike Weis, Tim Wies Process Server: Frederick Investigations, Inc. (Campbell, Greg)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant CCR Construction, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7339252, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis), Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Mike Weis, Rocky Kloth, Scott Byrne, Tod O'Donaghue, Donald Jr. Brussel, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Robert Calhoun, Keith Taylor, Dan Barger, James Carson, Todd Hake, Tim Schoolfield, Mike Hart, Kevin Deptula, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Dennis Joyce, John Gaal, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters' Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis), Kent Kiefner, Tim Wies, Dan Neiswander, Mark Boehms, Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Albert Bond, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Jim Sauer, Craig McPartlin, Robert Behlman, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Campbell, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council et al v. CCR Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gaal
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Joint Training Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Barger
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Kloth
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Neiswander
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Joyce
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Brussel, Jr.
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Behlman
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig McPartlin
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Hake
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Hesser
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carson
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Hart
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Deptula
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Wies
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Kiefner
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Weis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Bond
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Byrne
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Calhoun
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tod O'Donaghue
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Schoolfield
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Taylor
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Boehms
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Sauer
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCR Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?