Nash v. Saul
Plaintiff: Lavella Nash
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv02027
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 7/29/2019 by certified mail, answer due 9/27/2019. (CSG)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 7/31/2019 by certified mail, answer due 9/30/2019. (CSG)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas P. Llewellyn for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Llewellyn, Nicholas)
July 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons was mailed to USM - St. Louis. (MRS)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4, Administrative. Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss,motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty (60) days of service of plaintiffs complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (see order). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/19/19. (MRS)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis..IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issueon the complaint Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 7/19/19. (MRS)
July 18, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Lavella Nash. (BAK)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lavella Nash. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CJA 23)(Van Fossan, Kristen)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Lavella Nash. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons SSA Commissioner, #4 Summons US Attorney General, #5 Summons US Attorney)(Van Fossan, Kristen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nash v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavella Nash
Represented By: Kristen N. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicholas P. Llewellyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?