Poppiti v. United Industries Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Elba Poppiti
Defendant: Spectrum Brands, Inc. and United Industries Corp.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02028
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Special Entry of Appearance by Defendants Spectrum Brands, Inc., United Industries Corp.. (Wymore, Mary Ann) filed by United Industries Corp., Spectrum Brands, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 08/27/19. (CMH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Special Entry of Appearance by Defendants Spectrum Brands, Inc., United Industries Corp.. (Wymore, Mary Ann)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Elba Poppiti. Spectrum Brands, Inc. served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Kopel, Yitzchak)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Elba Poppiti. United Industries Corp. served on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Kopel, Yitzchak)
July 18, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons were emailed to attorney Yitzchak Kopel. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Elba Poppiti Process Server: First Legal Network (Kopel, Yitzchak)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Elba Poppiti.. (Kopel, Yitzchak)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Spectrum Brands, Inc., United Industries Corp. with receipt number AMOEDC-7339864, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Elba Poppiti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Notice of Intent to Use Process Server)(Kopel, Yitzchak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2019: #5 Original Filing Form) (BAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poppiti v. United Industries Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Ann L. Wymore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Industries Corp.
Represented By: Mary Ann L. Wymore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elba Poppiti
Represented By: Yitzchak Kopel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?