St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council et al v. Superior Turf Installation, LLC
Plaintiff: John Gaal, Donald Jr. Brussel, Dan Barger, Rocky Kloth, Dan Neiswander, Dennis Joyce, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Robert Behlman, Craig McPartlin, Todd Hake, Greg Hesser, James Carson, Mike Hart, Kevin Deptula, Tim Weis, Kent Kiefner, Mike Weis, Albert Bond, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Donald J. Brussell, Jr., Tod O'Donaghue, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Tim Schoolfield, Keith Taylor, Mark Boehms, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council and Jim Sauer
Defendant: Superior Turf Installation, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02063
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Jr. Brussel, Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Donald J. Brussell, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, James Carson, James Carson, James Carson, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Mike Weis, Tim Weis. (Campbell, Greg) filed by Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Dennis Joyce, Mike Hart, Tim Schoolfield, James Carson, Donald J. Brussell, Jr., Mike Weis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Scott Byrne, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Tim Weis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Greg Hesser, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Robert Behlman, Donald Jr. Brussel, Albert Bond, Keith Taylor, Todd Hake, John Gaal, Tod O'Donaghue, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Kent Kiefner, Jim Sauer, Mark Boehms, Dan Neiswander, Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Kevin Deptula, Dan Barger, Robert Calhoun ; SO ORDERED, Terminate Case. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 08/23/2019. (AAS)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Jr. Brussel, Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Donald J. Brussell, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, James Carson, James Carson, James Carson, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Mike Weis, Tim Weis. (Campbell, Greg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustess of the Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis), Mike Weis, Rocky Kloth, Scott Byrne, Tod O'Donaghue, Donald J. Brussell, Jr, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Robert Calhoun, Keith Taylor, Dan Barger, James Carson, Todd Hake, Tim Schoolfield, Donald Jr. Brussel, Mike Hart, Kevin Deptula, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Dennis Joyce, John Gaal, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis), Kent Kiefner, Tim Weis, Dan Neiswander, Mark Boehms, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Albert Bond, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Jim Sauer, Craig McPartlin, Robert Behlman, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis), Donald J. Brussel, Jr.. Superior Turf Installation, LLC served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Campbell, Greg)
July 22, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Greg A. Campbell. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Dan Barger, Robert Behlman, Mark Boehms, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Albert Bond, Donald Jr. Brussel, Donald J. Brussel, Jr., Donald J. Brussell, Jr, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Scott Byrne, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Robert Calhoun, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, James Carson, James Carson, James Carson, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, Kevin Deptula, John Gaal, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Todd Hake, Mike Hart, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Greg Hesser, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Dennis Joyce, Kent Kiefner, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Rocky Kloth, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Craig McPartlin, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Dan Neiswander, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Tod O'Donaghue, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Jim Sauer, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, Tim Schoolfield, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Keith Taylor, Mike Weis, Tim Weis Process Server: Frederick Investigations, Inc (Campbell, Greg)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Superior Turf Installation, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7346674, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustess of the Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis), Mike Weis, Rocky Kloth, Scott Byrne, Tod O'Donaghue, Donald J. Brussell, Jr, Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis, Robert Calhoun, Keith Taylor, Dan Barger, James Carson, Todd Hake, Tim Schoolfield, Donald Jr. Brussel, Mike Hart, Kevin Deptula, Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis, Dennis Joyce, John Gaal, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis), Kent Kiefner, Tim Weis, Dan Neiswander, Mark Boehms, Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis, Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis, Albert Bond, St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council, Jim Sauer, Craig McPartlin, Robert Behlman, Greg Hesser(in their representative capacities as Trustees of the Carpenters' Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis), Donald J. Brussel, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Campbell, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council et al v. Superior Turf Installation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gaal
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Jr. Brussel
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Barger
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Kloth
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Neiswander
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Joyce
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters' Health and Welfare Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Behlman
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig McPartlin
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Hake
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Hesser
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carson
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Hart
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Deptula
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Weis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Kiefner
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Weis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Bond
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Byrne
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Calhoun
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Brussel, Jr.
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Brussell, Jr.
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tod O'Donaghue
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters' Joint Training Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Schoolfield
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Taylor
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Boehms
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Vacation Trust Fund of St. Louis
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis-Kansas City Carpenters Regional Council
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Sauer
Represented By: Greg A. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Turf Installation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?