Syed v. Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: N.G.S., Shelly Renee Branch, Ashfaq Hussain Syed and A.M.S.
Defendant: Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02125
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Referring Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER OF REMAND. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri, in which it was filed. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/22/19. (EAB) (Order and docket sheet sent to STL County on 8/22/19)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER CONCERNING REMOVAL IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than seven days from the date of this Order, Defendant shall file a memorandum in support of its notice of removal that includes specific facts or evidence to establish by a preponderance of the evidence that an amount in excess of $75,000 is actually in controversy. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs may file a response no later than seven days after the memorandum is filed. No further briefing will be permitted. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/14/19. (KXS)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian T. Maye for Defendant Frontier Airlines, Inc.. (Maye, Brian)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig for all further proceedings (KJS)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Tara Shelke for Defendant Frontier Airlines, Inc.. (Shelke, Tara)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Memorandum in Support of MOTION to Dismiss :Counts I through V and Motion to Strike pursuant to 12(f)(2) is ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on August 6, 2019. (HEH)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #7 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts I through V and Motion to Strike pursuant to 12(f)(2) The Parties Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to defendant's partial motion to dismiss and Strike by Defendant Frontier Airlines, Inc.. (Berwin, David)
July 31, 2019 ***REMARK Emailed counsel in regards to the wrong document being filed. motion #7 . (AAS)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Frontier Airlines, Inc..(Berwin, David)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts I through V and Motion to Strike pursuant to 12(f)(2) filed by Defendant Frontier Airlines, Inc.. (Berwin, David)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts I through V and Motion to Strike pursuant to 12(f)(2) by Defendant Frontier Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint)(Berwin, David) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/31/2019) (AAS).
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by David C. Berwin for Defendant Frontier Airlines, Inc.. (Berwin, David)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate: by Defendant Frontier Airlines, Inc. (Berwin, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
July 23, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Shelly Renee Branch, N.G.S., A.M.S., Ashfaq Hussain Syed.(BAK)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendant Frontier Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiff of Removal (Berwin, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 19SL-CC02229, with receipt number AMOEDC-7349692, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Frontier Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2, #3 Exhibit Exh. 3)(Berwin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Syed v. Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.G.S.
Represented By: W. Bevis Schock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Renee Branch
Represented By: W. Bevis Schock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashfaq Hussain Syed
Represented By: W. Bevis Schock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.S.
Represented By: W. Bevis Schock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frontier Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: David C. Berwin
Represented By: Tara Shelke
Represented By: Brian T. Maye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?