Broniec et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Michael E Broniec, Patricia Broniec and Michael E. Broniec
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc., Matthew W Smith and Matthew W. Smith
Case Number: 4:2019cv02140
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to defendant Matthew W. Smith. The summons was emailed to Michael J Smith. (MRS)
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Michael E. Broniec, Patricia Broniec (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Smith, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) Defenses and Affirmative Defenses by C.R. England, Inc..(Fritz, Kevin)
July 25, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Michael E. Broniec, Patricia Broniec.(MFG)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Rodney Dale Fourez, II for Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Fourez, Rodney)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick E. Foppe for Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Foppe, Patrick)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Kevin L. Fritz for Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Fritz, Kevin)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. (Fritz, Kevin)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant C.R. England, Inc.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Fritz, Kevin)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant C.R. England, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Fritz, Kevin)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 19SL-CC02594, with receipt number AMOEDC-7353581, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by C.R. England, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Fritz, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broniec et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E Broniec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Broniec
Represented By: Michael J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael E. Broniec
Represented By: Michael J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. England, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin L. Fritz
Represented By: Rodney Dale Fourez, II
Represented By: Patrick E. Foppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew W Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew W. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?