Innovative Timing Systems LLC v. End Max Sports, Inc.
Plaintiff: Innovative Timing Systems LLC
Defendant: End Max Sports, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02246
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Deadline for Defendant's First Responsive Pleading by Plaintiff Innovative Timing Systems LLC. (McAndrews, Matthew) filed by Innovative Timing Systems LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 08/22/19. (CMH)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Deadline for Defendant's First Responsive Pleading by Plaintiff Innovative Timing Systems LLC. (McAndrews, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Innovative Timing Systems LLC. End Max Sports, Inc. served on 8/3/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (McAndrews, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew G. McAndrews for Plaintiff Innovative Timing Systems LLC. (McAndrews, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D. Wallenberg for Plaintiff Innovative Timing Systems LLC. (Wallenberg, Kyle)
July 29, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Matthew G. McAndrews. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent. (BAK)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Innovative Timing Systems LLC. Parent companies: None., Subsidiaries: None., Publicly held company: None.,. (McAndrews, Matthew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Intent to Use Process Server: by Plaintiff Innovative Timing Systems LLC re #1 Complaint, Exhibits, and Summons (McAndrews, Matthew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against defendant End Max Sports, Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-7358879, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Innovative Timing Systems LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form, #7 Summons)(McAndrews, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Timing Systems LLC v. End Max Sports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Timing Systems LLC
Represented By: Matthew G. McAndrews
Represented By: Kyle D. Wallenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: End Max Sports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?