Clark v. Drug Enforcement Administration
Plaintiff: James Clark
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration
Case Number: 4:2019cv02280
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1341
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Fri Sep 13 14:34:44 CDT 2019 (Shirley, Kelley)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/13/19. (KJS)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Fri Aug 9 14:54:57 CDT 2019 (Shepard, Alicia)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courts form Civil Complaint and an Application To Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is advised that his amended complaint will take the place of his original complaint and will be the only pleading that this Court will review. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the $400 filing fee or submit the application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss this action without prejudice. (cc: plaintiff a copy of the Courts form Civil Complaint and an Application To Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs.) Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 8/30/2019. Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 8/30/2019.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 08/09/2019. (AAS)
July 31, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Jul 31 16:00:42 CDT 2019 (admin,)
July 31, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (MFG)
July 31, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Motion Forfeiture of Property) against defendant Drug Enforcement Administration Non-Jury Demand,, filed by James Clark. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MFG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?