Clower v. Manley et al
Plaintiff: La'Ron M. Clower
Defendant: Joshua L. Delmain, Matthew A. West, Jessica R. Treece, Crawford County, Missouri, John and Jane Doe, 1 - 10, Christopher Bach and Diane N. Manley
Case Number: 4:2019cv02284
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 21 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant Crawford County, Missouri, Joshua L. Delmain, Diane N. Manley, Jessica R. Treece, Matthew A. West. The summonses were emailed to Attorney R. Plunkert. (TMT)
September 16, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Returned Unexecuted by La'Ron M. Clower as to Jessica R. Treece. (Plunkert, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Returned Unexecuted by La'Ron M. Clower as to Joshua L. Delmain. (Plunkert, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted by La'Ron M. Clower as to Diane N. Manley. (Plunkert, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted by La'Ron M. Clower as to Crawford County, Missouri. (Plunkert, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted by La'Ron M. Clower as to Matthew A. West. (Plunkert, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 20 EXHIBITS Received: Exhibit A by Plaintiff La'Ron M. Clower. Exhibit A is kept in disc format in Clerk's Office. (AFC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert T. Plunkert for Plaintiff La'Ron M. Clower. (Plunkert, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff La'Ron M. Clower Process Server: Kenneth L. Nickles (Plunkert, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM Request for Issuance of Alias Summons on Defendant Matthew West by Plaintiff La'Ron M. Clower. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Defendant Matthew West)(Plunkert, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM Request for Issuance of Alias Summons on Defendant Joshua L. Delmain by Plaintiff La'Ron M. Clower. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Defendant Joshua L. Delmain)(Plunkert, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM Request for Issuance of Alias Summons on Defendant Jessica R. Nowland by Plaintiff La'Ron M. Clower. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Defendant Jessica R. Nowland)(Plunkert, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM Request for Issuance of Alias Summons on Defendant Crawford County, Missouri by Plaintiff La'Ron M. Clower. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Defendant Crawford County, Missouri)(Plunkert, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM Request for Issuance of Alias Summons on Defendant Diane N. Manley by Plaintiff La'Ron M. Clower. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons to Defendant Manley)(Plunkert, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants Amendment to #1 Complaint, yes Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued no, Consents issued no, Jury demand, , filed by La'Ron M. Clower. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by La'Ron M. Clower. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Hard Filing DVD)(Plunkert, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 EXHIBITS Received: A to Complaint filed in DVD format by Plaintiff La'Ron M. Clower.. (BRP)
August 2, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 6 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Robert T. Plunkert. Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (MFG)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter J. Dunne for Plaintiff La'Ron M. Clower. (Dunne, Peter)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert T. Plunkert for Plaintiff La'Ron M. Clower. (Plunkert, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff La'Ron M. Clower. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Plunkert, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff La'Ron M. Clower Process Server: Kenneth Nickles (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - Defendant Manley, #2 Summons Summons - Defendant Crawford County, #3 Summons Summons - Defendant Treece, #4 Summons Summons - Defendant Delmain, #5 Summons Summons - Defendant West, #6 Summons Summons - Defendant Bach)(Plunkert, Robert)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7373567, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by La'Ron M. Clower. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Hard Filing, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Plunkert, Robert) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/2/2019) (MFG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clower v. Manley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua L. Delmain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew A. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica R. Treece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawford County, Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe, 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane N. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'Ron M. Clower
Represented By: Peter J. Dunne
Represented By: Robert T. Plunkert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?