Axis Surplus Insurance Company v. Associated Equipment Corporation
Plaintiff: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Defendant: Associated Equipment Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv02333
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Alias Summons Issued as to defendant Associated Equipment Corporation. The summons was emailed to plaintiff's attorney. (KKS)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Request for Alias Summons: by Plaintiff Axis Surplus Insurance Company re #4 Notice (Other), (Tomlinson, Wilbur)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Wilbur L. Tomlinson for Plaintiff Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Tomlinson, Wilbur)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Intent to Use Process Server: by Plaintiff Axis Surplus Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Tomlinson, Wilbur) (Main Document 4 and Attachment 1 replaced on 9/30/2019 to include case number with initials of judge) (KKS).
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER of Service issued defendantAssociated Equipment Corporation. sent to William Cottle, Registered Agent for Associated Equipment Corporation on August 12, 2019 filed by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. Waiver of Service due by 9/11/2019. (Cole, Clark)
August 12, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Axis Surplus Insurance Company. Parent companies: AXIS Insurance Company, which is in turn wholly owned by AXIS Specialty U.S. Holdings, Inc., which in turn in wholly owned by AXIS Specialty Global Holdings Limited, which is wholly owned by AXIS Capital Holdings Limited, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: AXIS Capital Holdings Limited,. (Cole, Clark)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against defendant Associated Equipment Corporation with receipt number AMOEDC-7389170, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Axis Surplus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Adjuster Gardner's June 21, 2018 Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - Appraisal Demand dated April 22, 2019, #4 Exhibit D - May 31, 2019 Response to Appraisal Demand, #5 Exhibit E - June 25, 2019 Appraisal Demand, #6 Exhibit F - July 11, 2019 Response to June 25, 2019 Appraisal Demand, #7 Original Filing Form, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cole, Clark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Axis Surplus Insurance Company v. Associated Equipment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Equipment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axis Surplus Insurance Company
Represented By: Clark H. Cole
Represented By: Wilbur L. Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?