Napoli v. Department of the Treasury et al
Plaintiff: Monica Napoli
Defendant: Department of the Treasury and Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 4:2019cv02383
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Monica Napoli. (KEK)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Monica Napoli. (KEK) Modified address in CM/ECF on 9/18/2019 (CMC).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Tue Sep 3 15:51:25 CDT 2019 (Phillips, Nicole)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff an Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed without prepaying fees or costs within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. (Response to Court due by 9/24/2019.). Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Form)(NEP)
August 21, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Aug 21 11:00:43 CDT 2019 (admin,)
August 21, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
August 21, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JWD)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Jury Demand, filed by Monica Napoli. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Napoli v. Department of the Treasury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?