United States of America v. $390,890.00 U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $390,890.00 U.S. Currency
Case Number: 4:2019cv02434
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Public Notification. (McClure-Hartman, Lindsay)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Jury Demand by George Ulloa.(Shamansky, Samuel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Samuel H Shamansky for Claimant George Ulloa. (Shamansky, Samuel)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 CLAIM filed by Claimant George Ullua re Complaint #1 filed by Claimant George Ullua. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(MCB)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 MARSHAL Return Executed - party served: Rommy Ulloa, Type of return: Complaint & Notice. (AFC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 MARSHAL Return Executed - party served: Ivan Eduardo Ulloa, Type of return: Complaint & Notice. (AFC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 MARSHAL Return Executed - party served: Samuel Shamansky; Type of return: Complaint & Notice. (AFC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return executed; party served: George Anibal Ulloa by certified mail on September 3, 2019; Type of return: Complaint and Notice.(MCB)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return Executed; Party served $390,890.00 U.S. Currency, Type of return Complaint and Warrant served on Asset on 8/29/19.
August 28, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (MFG)
August 28, 2019 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendant $390,890.00 U.S. Currency. (MFG)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant $390,890.00 U.S. Currency Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(McClure-Hartman, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $390,890.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $390,890.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lindsay L. McClure-Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?