United States of America v. Smith and Wesson M&P 9 Shield Pistol, SN: HMU3526
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Smith and Wesson M&P 9 Shield Pistol, SN: HMU3526
Case Number: 4:2019cv02462
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by United States of America as to Smith and Wesson M&P 9 Shield Pistol, SN: HMU3526. 10/23/19 - Returned unexecuted as to Brian Shields - Return to Sender (KKS)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Unexecuted by United States of America as to Smith and Wesson M&P 9 Shield Pistol, SN: HMU3526. 10/23/19 - Returned unexecuted as to Candice Webb - Return to Sender (KKS)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION filed by Plaintiff United States of America of Public Notification. (Casey, Stephen)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 MARSHAL Return Executed party served Smith & Wesson M&P 9 Shield pistol, SN: HMU3526, Type of return: Complaint & Warrant, (KKS)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 MARSHAL Return as to Smith & Wesson M&P 9 Shield pistol, SN: HMU3526, Executed, party served Kenneth Rapp, Type of return Complaint & Notice, Delivered on 9/3/19 (KKS)
August 30, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (MFG)
August 30, 2019 Forfeiture Warrant Issued as to defendantSmith and Wesson M&P 9 Shield Pistol, SN: HMU3526. (MFG)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Forfeiture against defendant Smith and Wesson M&P 9 Shield Pistol, SN: HMU3526 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Warrant)(Casey, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Smith and Wesson M&P 9 Shield Pistol, SN: HMU3526
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith and Wesson M&P 9 Shield Pistol, SN: HMU3526
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stephen R. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?