Deighan Law LLC v. Daugherty
Debtor: Laura Inez Richard, Luis Flores, Elizabeth Mae Bratcher, Chiquetta Hunter, Bennie Ray Bratcher, Bethany F. Prince, Larry Wayne Ohlau and Judith Kay Ohlau
Appellee: Diana Daugherty
Trustee: Office of U.S. Trustee
Appellant: Deighan Law LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02506
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 ***REMARK - Document and docket entry #8 deleted as being a duplicate of main document of #7. (CSG)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant's BRIEF by Deighan Law LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit A-M, #3 Appendix Table of Contents, #4 Exhibit A-K, #5 Appendix Table of Contents, #6 Exhibit A-L, #7 Appendix Table of Contents, #8 Exhibit A-K, #9 Appendix Table of Contents, #10 Exhibit A-K, #11 Appendix Table of Contents, #12 Exhibit A-K)(Eggmann, Robert) Modified on 10/10/2019 (CSG).
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph M. Wilson for Appellee Diana Daugherty. (Wilson, Joseph)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases -Unopposed Consolidate with higher case number 19-02521, 19-02522, 19-02523, 19-02524, 19-02525 filed by Deighan Law LLC. This matter is before the Court on appellee Diana Daughtery's Motion to Consolidate [ECF 4]. All parties agree. Appellee's motion is GRANTED and cases: Deighan Law LLC v. Diana Daugherty (In re Chiquetta Hunter), No. 4:19-cv-02521-RWS; Deighan Law LLC v. Diana Daugherty (In re Luis Flores), No. 4:19-cv-02522-JCH; Deighan Law LLC v. Diana Daugherty (In re Bennie Rae and Elizabeth Mae Bratcher), No. 4:19-cv-02523-AGF; Deighan Law LLC v. Diana Daugherty (In re Bethany F. Prince), No. 4:19-cv-02524-SRC; and Deighan Law LLC v. Diana Daugherty (In re Larry and Judith Ohlau), No. 4:19-cv-02525-AGF are transferred to the Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr., to be consolidated with Deighan Law LLC v. Diana Daugherty (In re Laura Inez Richard), No. 4:19-cv-02506-SNLJ. All future pleadings shall be filed under Case No. 4:19CV02506 SNLJ. See Local Rule 42 4.03 Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/24/19. (CSG) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/1/2019) (CSG).
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases -Unopposed Consolidate with higher case number 19-02521, 19-02522, 19-02523, 19-02524, 19-02525 by Appellant Deighan Law LLC. (Eggmann, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Jerry L Jensen for Trustee Office of US Trustee. (Jensen, Jerry)
September 9, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (JWD)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: BANKRUPTCY APPEAL This case is assigned to Track: 4 Dispositive Motions due by 9/19/2019. (JWD)
September 9, 2019 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record. Bankruptcy Petition #: 16-42080. Documents listed below may be viewed at # [Bankruptcy Court Pacer] [RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Laura Inez Richard, 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Laura Inez Richard, 12 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch), 13 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor filed by Debtor Laura Inez Richard, 14 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch), 17 Response filed by Debtor Laura Inez Richard, 19 Trustee's Motion for Order Directing Upright Law to Disgorge Attorney Fees and Directing that the Trustee Pay Attorney Fees to Michael Doyel filed by Trustee John V. LaBarge, 24 Motion to Consolidate filed by Respondent Upright Law LLC, 30 Order Granting Consolidation, 34 Response filed by Respondent Upright Law LLC, Respondent Michael Doyel, 40 Transcript filed by Reporter, 42 Stipulation filed by Respondent Upright Law LLC, Respondent Michael Doyel, Respondent John C Caraker, Respondent Andrew Magdy, 43 Support/Supplement filed by Trustee John V. LaBarge, 47 Response filed by Respondent Upright Law LLC, Respondent Michael Doyel, Respondent John C Caraker, Respondent Andrew Magdy, 69 Motion for Direction filed by Trustee Diana S. Daugherty, 70Joinder Motion filed by Respondent Upright Law LLC, Respondent Michael Doyel, 71 Order granting Trustee's Motion for Order Directing Upright Law to Disgorge Attorney's Fees and Directing the Trustee Pay Attorney's Fees to Debtor's Counsel in Consolidated Cases 74 Support/Supplement filed by Respondent Upright Law LLC, Respondent Michael Doyel, Respondent John C Caraker, Respondent Andrew Magdy, 75 Motion to Amend filed by Respondent Upright Law LLC, Respondent Michael Doyel, Respondent John C Caraker, Respondent Andrew Magdy, 79 Response filed by Trustee Diana S. Daugherty, 80 Support/Supplement filed by Trustee Diana S. Daugherty, 99 Order on Motion to Amend, 101 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by Respondent Upright Law LLC, 102 Appellant Designation filed by Respondent Upright Law LLC, Statement of Issues on Appeal, 103 Auto-docket of Internet Credit Card Receipt, 104 Notice of Appellants Obligation, 107 Appellee Designation filed by Trustee Diana S. Daugherty, 108 Appellee Designation filed by Trustee Diana S. Daugherty, 109 Appellee Designation filed by U.S. Trustee Office of US Trustee, 112 Transcript filed by Reporter), Electronic Report of Docket Entries for 16-42080 Laura Inez Richard](JWD)
September 9, 2019 ***REMARK - The Notice Of Bankruptcy appeal filed in this case indicates "Bankruptcy Case Nos. 16-42080-659,16-42840-399,16-43227-659,16-20099-705, 16-10094-399, 16-40505-399 (Consolidated Cases)". The Bankruptcy Clerk of Court was contacted on 9/9/2019 and confirmed that these cases were never substantively consolidated. Therefore, each of the above noted bankruptcy case numbers have been assigned individual District Court case numbers. (MRC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-42080. by Appellant Deighan Law LLC. (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deighan Law LLC v. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Laura Inez Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Luis Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Elizabeth Mae Bratcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Chiquetta Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Bennie Ray Bratcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Bethany F. Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Larry Wayne Ohlau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Judith Kay Ohlau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Diana Daugherty
Represented By: Diana S. Daugherty
Represented By: Joseph M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of U.S. Trustee
Represented By: Jerry L Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Deighan Law LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Eggmann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?