Moore v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc et al
Plaintiff: Dawn Marie Moore
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. and Ascension Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 4:2019cv02513
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/15/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/22/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Catherine D. Perry. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on October 7, 2019. (BRP)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. Parent companies: Sedgwick, L.P., Sedgwick Holdings, Inc., and Lightning Cayman Merger Sub, Ltd. The parent company of these 3 is Sedgwick, L.P., who is owned by Stone Point Capital, CDPQ and various investors which are affiliates of The Carlyle Group, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Blaisdell, Amy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Ascension Long Term Disability Plan. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Blaisdell, Amy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Ascension Long Term Disability Plan, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc..(Blaisdell, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel Robert Ritter for Defendants Ascension Long Term Disability Plan, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Ritter, Daniel)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Amy L. Blaisdell for Defendants Ascension Long Term Disability Plan, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Blaisdell, Amy)
September 6, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (BAK)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-01099. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.
September 6, 2019 Case Electronically Transmitted to the Eastern District of Missouri on 9/6/19. (lh)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #6 Stipulation to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri, filed by Dawn Marie Moore, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 09/05/2019. The Clerk is directed to effectuate the transfer. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Transfer Plaintiffs Lawsuit to US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri by All Plaintiffs. (Schroder, Danielle)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate on 08/15/2019 by Ascension Long Term Disability Plan (Schroder, Danielle) Modified on 8/26/2019 (cav).
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate on 08/12/2019 by Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc (Schroder, Danielle) Modified on 8/26/2019 (cav).
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Schroder, Danielle)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Schroder, Danielle)
July 31, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mac)
July 30, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Dawn Marie Moore. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3175708) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc, #3 Summons Ascension Long Term Disability Plan)(Schroder, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Amy L. Blaisdell
Represented By: Daniel Robert Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ascension Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: Amy L. Blaisdell
Represented By: Daniel Robert Ritter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Marie Moore
Represented By: Danielle M Schroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?