Elsner v. Saul
Plaintiff: Ellen Elsner
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv02517
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Social Security: Black Lung
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service showing service on defendant by certified mail to Office of Regional Counsel on 09/16/19. (CMH)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service showing service on defendant by certified mail to U.S. Attorney General on 09/20/19. (CMH)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by U.S. Marshal Service. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 9/16/2019 through U.S. Attorney's Office, answer due 11/15/2019. (CSG)
September 10, 2019 Summonses Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summonses were mailed to U.S. Marshal Service, St. Louis, Missouri. (CSG)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [#2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 09/09/19. (CMH)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been assigned to Track 4 (Administrative). Pursuant to 12(a)(3) and (4), Fed.R.Civ.P., defendant must file any motion to dismiss, motion to remand, and/or answer within sixty ( 60) days of service of plaintiffs complaint. Along with its answer defendant shall file a transcript of the record, in accordance with 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Pursuant to E.D.Mo.L.R. 9.02, plaintiff must, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, serve and file a brief within thirty (30) days after the Commissioner's service of an answer and the administrative transcript. The Commissioner must serve and file a brief within thirty (30) days after the service of the plaintiffs brief. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days after service of the Commissioner's brief to file a reply brief. No further briefs shall be filed except by leave of court upon a showing of good cause. A brief filed pursuant to E.D.Mo.L.R. 9.02 shall not exceed fifteen (15) standard typed pages, exclusive of a signature page and attachments, without leave of court. A reply brief shall not exceed ten (10) pages. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 09/09/19. (CMH)
September 9, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (BAK)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Ellen Elsner. (BAK)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff ELLEN ELSNER. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit financial affidavit)(Van Fossan, Jennifer)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Commissioner of Social Security Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Ellen Elsner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Summons US Attorney General, #5 Summons Chief Counsel)(Van Fossan, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elsner v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Elsner
Represented By: Jennifer M. Van Fossan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Jane Rund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?