Shockley v. Crews
Petitioner: Lance Shockley
Respondent: Travis Crews
Case Number: 4:2019cv02520
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Referring Judge: Rodney W Sippel
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court GRANTS, in part, and DENIES, in part, without prejudice, Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #11 . Petitioner must file his Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus no later than June 3, 2020. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 11/1/2019. (CLO)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ;Proposed extension date 09/03/2020 by Petitioner Lance Shockley. (Weis, Jeremy)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Paula Kay Harms for Petitioner Lance Shockley. (Harms, Paula)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Jeremy S. Weis for Petitioner Lance Shockley. (Weis, Jeremy)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CAPITAL HABEAS SCHEDULING ORDER: 1. Habeas Corpus Petition. Petitioner shall file his petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254 on or before February 10, 2020. Petitioner shall file a supporting memorandum of law no later than sixty (60) days after the date of the filing of the petition. Each claim for relief must be numbered separately and must include the following information: (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/19/2019. (CLO)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender's Office for the Western District of Missouri Capital Habeas Unit is APPOINTED to represent petitioner in this action, and as such, counsel's motions for appointment of counsel #2 , #3 are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after such time as secondary counsel, the Southern District of Ohio CHU, is approved to appear in this action pursuant to the out- of-district protocol, the Southern District of Ohio CHU shall move separately for appointment of counsel on behalf of petitioner. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that simultaneously with this Memorandum and Order, the Court shall issue an Initial Scheduling Order in this Capital Habeas Action. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/19/2019. (CLO)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr no longer assigned to case. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Clark for all further proceedings. (MRS)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER..The undersigned U. S. District Judge recuses himself in this matter.The Clerk of the District Court is hereby directed to refer this case to anotherjudge by random selection. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/11/19. (MRS)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). The above styled and numbered case was opened on September 9, 2019. At the direction of the Court, this case must be reassigned. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-styled cause is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr., United States District Judge. (JWD)
September 9, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JWD)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel in a Habeas Corpus Action in a Death Penalty Case by Petitioner Lance Shockley. (Weis, Jeremy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel in a Habeas Corpus Action in a Death Penalty Case by Petitioner Lance Shockley. (Weis, Jeremy) Clerk's note: motion signed by petitioner only. (JWD)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Lance Shockley. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed as a Poor Person)(Weis, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shockley v. Crews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lance Shockley
Represented By: Jeremy S. Weis
Represented By: Paula Kay Harms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Travis Crews
Represented By: Caroline M. Coulter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?