Deighan Law LLC v. Daugherty
Appellee: Diana Daugherty
Debtor: Elizabeth Mae Bratcher and Bennie Ray Bratcher
Trustee: Office of U.S. Trustee
Appellant: Deighan Law LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02523
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Audrey G Fleissig
Referring Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr for all further proceedings. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton; District Judge Rodney W. Sippel; District Judge Stephen R. Clark and District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig no longer assigned to case. This matter is before the Court on appellee Diana Daughterty's Motion to Consolidate [ECF 4]. All parties agree. Appellee's motion is GRANTED and cases: Deighan Law LLC v. Diana Daugherty (In re Chiquetta Hunter), No. 4:19-cv-02521-RWS; Deighan Law LLC v. Diana Daugherty (In re Luis Flores), No. 4:19-cv-02522-JCH; Deighan Law LLC v. Diana Daugherty (In re Bennie Rae and Elizabeth Mae Bratcher), No. 4:19-cv-02523-AGF; Deighan Law LLC v. Diana Daugherty (In re Bethany F. Prince), No. 4:19-cv-02524-SRC; and Deighan Law LLC v. Diana Daugherty (In re Larry and Judith Ohlau), No. 4:19-cv-02525-AGF are transferred to the Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr., to be consolidated with Deighan Law LLC v. Diana Daugherty (In re Laura Inez Richard), No. 4:19-cv-02506-SNLJ. All future pleadings shall be filed under Case No. 4:19CV02506 SNLJ. See Local Rule 42 4.03 Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/24/19. (CSG) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/2/2019) (CSG).
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to consolidated by Appellant Deighan Law LLC with case number 19-02506 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eggmann, Robert)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Appellant's Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Cases, seeking to consolidate this case with Deighan Law LLC v. Diana Daugherty (In re Laura Inez Richard), No. 4:19-cv-02506-SNLJ, is DENIED without prejudice. ECF No. #3 . Pursuant to Local Rule 4.03, Appellant must file the motion to consolidate in the case bearing the lowest cause number, Case No. 4:19-cv-02506-SNLJ, and file a notice of the motion in each related case, to which a copy of the motion shall be attached. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/19/2019. (AFC)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED Certificate of Service by Appellant Deighan Law LLC. Amendment to #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases -Unopposed Consolidate with higher case number 19-02506 //Amended Certificate of Service. (Eggmann, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases -Unopposed Consolidate with higher case number 19-02506 by Appellant Deighan Law LLC. (Eggmann, Robert)
September 9, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (JWD)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: BANKRUPTCY APPEAL This case is assigned to Track: 4 Dispositive Motions due by 9/19/2019. (JWD)
September 9, 2019 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record. Documents listed below may be viewed at # [Bankruptcy Court Pacer] (RE: related document(s)1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) filed by Debtor Bennie Ray Bratcher, Debtor Elizabeth Mae Bratcher, 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Bennie Ray Bratcher, Debtor Elizabeth Mae Bratcher, 13 Generic Motion filed by Trustee John V. LaBarge, Generic Motion Second Part, 18 Motion to Consolidate filed by Respondent Upright Law LLC, 22 Order (Generic), 25 Response filed by Respondent Upright Law LLC, Respondent Andrew Magdy, 26 Support/Supplement filed by Trustee John V. LaBarge, 46 Generic Order, Generic Order Second Part, 63 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election filed by Respondent Upright Law LLC, 64 Appellant Designation filed by Respondent Upright Law LLC, Statement of Issues on Appeal, 65 Auto-docket of Internet Credit Card Receipt, 68 Appellee Designation filed by Trustee Diana S. Daugherty, 69 Appellee Designation filed by Trustee Diana S. Daugherty, 70 Appellee Designation filed by U.S. Trustee Office of US Trustee, 71 Appellee Designation filed by U.S. Trustee Office of US Trustee) 16-42080 Laura Inez Richard: Doc 42 Joint Stipulation of Facts in Consolidated Cases with Exhibits A,B,C and D, Doc 74 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Alter or Amend Order of 10/10/2018 (doc 71) entered in consolidated cases, Doc 75 Motion to Alter or Amend Order of October 10, 2018, (doc 71) entered in consolidated cases, Doc 79 Chapter 13 Trustee's Response to Motion to Alter Or Amend Order of October 10, 2018 (doc 71) entered in consolidated cases, Doc 80 Memorandum of Law, Doc 99 Order Denying Motion to Alter or Amend Order of October 10, 2018 (doc 71) entered in consolidated cases, Electronic Report of Docket Entries for 16-20099 Bennie Ray Bratcher and Elizabeth Mae Bratcher, Transcript of Hearing held on 11/14/16 in the 16-42080 Laura Inez Richard case.) (JWD)
September 9, 2019 ***REMARK - The Notice Of Bankruptcy appeal filed in this case indicates "Bankruptcy Case Nos. 16-42080-659,16-42840-399,16-43227-659,16-20099-705, 16-10094-399, 16-40505-399 (Consolidated Cases)". The Bankruptcy Clerk of Court was contacted on 9/9/2019 and confirmed that these cases were never substantively consolidated. Therefore, each of the above noted bankruptcy case numbers have been assigned individual District Court case numbers. (MRC)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-20099. by Appellant Deighan Law LLC. (JWD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deighan Law LLC v. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Diana Daugherty
Represented By: Diana S. Daugherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Elizabeth Mae Bratcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Bennie Ray Bratcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Deighan Law LLC
Represented By: Robert E. Eggmann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?