Meyer et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Wanda J Meyer and Herschel J Meyer
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2019cv02534
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (DLB)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-03757. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB)
September 9, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #6 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
November 1, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX178093 as to Amy Collignon Gunn. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 31, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Amy Collignon Gunn on behalf of Herschel J Meyer, Wanda J Meyer. (MAP)
October 31, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Herschel J Meyer, Wanda J Meyer. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 31, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-3757-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
October 31, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13558046 filed by Wanda J Meyer, Herschel J Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda J Meyer
Represented By: John G. Simon
Represented By: Amy Collignon Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herschel J Meyer
Represented By: John G. Simon
Represented By: Amy Collignon Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?