Montgomery et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Montgomery and Sarah Montgomery
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2019cv02535
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Referring Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16 set for November 13, 2019, is vacated. The Case Management Order will be issued based on the dates provided by the parties in their Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/08/2019. (AAS)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. . (Stubbs, Kara)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Parent companies: Becton, Dickinson and Company, Subsidiaries: C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Publicly held company: Becton, Dickinson and Company,. (Stubbs, Kara)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE - See Order For Full Details - Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/6/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/13/2019 01:45 PM in Telephone before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/22/2019. (AAS)
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings (CLO)
October 10, 2019 SECOND Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, Plaintiffs Christopher Montgomery, Sarah Montgomery to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/16/2019. (JAB)
October 4, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, Plaintiffs Christopher Montgomery, Sarah Montgomery to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicole Y Silver for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Silver, Nicole)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE Entry of Appearance: by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Silver, Nicole)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lori G. Cohen, representing Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 09/26/2019. (RTS)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lori G. Cohen. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7483274) by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 List of Bar Memberships, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Cohen, Lori)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Tue Sep 24 09:24:52 CDT 2019 (Stamm, Katie)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated; by attorney Richard B. North of the law firm Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 09/23/2019. (RTS)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Richard B. North, Jr. by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Kara T. Stubbs for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Stubbs, Kara)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 10, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (DLB)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-00752. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically.(DLB)
September 9, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Missouri via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-00752-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16499041 filed by Sarah Montgomery, Christopher Montgomery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Nicole Y Silver
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Kara T. Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Nicole Y Silver
Represented By: Lori Gail Cohen
Represented By: Kara T. Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Montgomery
Represented By: John G. Simon
Represented By: Amy Collignon Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Montgomery
Represented By: John G. Simon
Represented By: Amy Collignon Gunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?