Cain v. Saul
Plaintiff: Angela Cain
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 4:2019cv02537
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Clark
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed (U.S. Attorney General) filed by Angela Cain. (JAB)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed (Office of Regional Chief Counsel) filed by Angela Cain. (JAB)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Jane Rund for Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Rund, Jane)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Angela Cain. Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (CLO)
September 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. The summons were hand delivered to USMS. (KKS)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - TRACK 4: SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/13/19. (KKS)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue on the complaint. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 9/13/19. (KKS)
September 11, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen R. Clark. (BAK)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Plaintiff Angela Cain. (BAK)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Angela Cain. (Overton, Kathleen)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 Social Security COMPLAINT Non-Jury Demand,Yes or No - Yes,, filed by Angela Cain. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons US Atty, #4 Summons Atty General, #5 Summons Office of Regional Counsel)(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cain v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Cain
Represented By: Kathleen E. Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?