Porter v. Stonecrest of Clayton View
Plaintiff: Ashley Porter
Defendant: Stonecrest of Clayton View
Case Number: 4:2019cv02538
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Stonecrest of Clayton View Amendment to #1 Complaint,, filed by Ashley Porter. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Ashley Porter.(JMP)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's employment discrimination complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint on the Court-provided form in accordance with this order within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Plaintiff's failure to timely file a second amended complaint in compliance with this order will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 12/1/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 11/1/2019. (AFC) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #1 Attachment Employment Discrimination Form) (AFC).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff Ashley Porter's motion for extension of time to file amended complaint (ECF No. #6 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 11/1/2019. (AFC)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Stonecrest of Clayton View Amendment to #1 Complaint filed by Ashley Porter. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Ashley Porter.(MCB)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of: time to file complaint out of time by Plaintiff Ashley Porter. (MCB)
September 30, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (BAK)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. sent to non-electronic party this date Thu Sep 12 12:00:45 CDT 2019 (Berg, Melanie)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 2) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must provide plaintiff with a copy of the Courts employment discrimination complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form, in accordance with the instructions set forth above, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Plaintiff's failure to timely comply with this order will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on September 12, 2019. (Memorandum and Order and 'court's employment discrimination form' sent to plaintiff this date.)(MCB)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 11, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Wed Sep 11 11:01:20 CDT 2019 (admin,)
September 11, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (BAK)
September 11, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (BAK)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ashley Porter. (BAK)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ashley Porter. (BAK)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Stonecrest of Clayton View Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Ashley Porter. (Attachments: #1 MCHR Right to Sue Charging Letter, #2 EEOC Right to Sue Charging Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Stonecrest of Clayton View
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonecrest of Clayton View
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?