Freeman et al v. Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Terry Freeman and Andrew Trout
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. and Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02550
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Campbell, Mark)
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Campbell, Mark)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants; ORDERED DENIED as MOOT as motion is directed to original complaint and plaintiff has now filed an amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/17/19. (CDP)
October 10, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. Amendment to #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer), , filed by Terry Freeman, Andrew Trout. Related document: #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer), filed by Terry Freeman, Andrew Trout. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M)(Cornfeld, Richard)
September 27, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Molly Carella for Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Carella, Molly)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER Re: #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; ORDERED GRANTED. Plaintiffs granted up to and including October 10, 2019 in which to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 09/25/2019. (TMT)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of: Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Terry Freeman, Andrew Trout. (Cornfeld, Richard)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark D. Campbell. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7479238) by Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Campbell, Mark) filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 09/25/2019. (TMT)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark D. Campbell. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7479238) by Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Campbell, Mark)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Davis, Bria)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Davis, Bria)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. Notice to State Court of Filing of Removal - Acknowledged by Clerk of the Court Sent To: State Court - Executed (Davis, Bria)
September 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (MFG)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Terry Freeman, Andrew Trout. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(MFG)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Bria L. Davis for Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. (Davis, Bria)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Removal and Exhibits)(Davis, Bria)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.. Parent companies: Toyota North America, Inc., Subsidiaries: Toyota Motor Sales, USA, Inc. and Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.,. (Davis, Bria)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st Judicial Circuit Court, County of St.Louis County, Missouri, case number 19SL-CC03022, with receipt number AMOEDC-7457581, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Original Filing Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, Bria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman et al v. Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Trout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor North America, Inc.
Represented By: Bria L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Bria L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc.
Represented By: Bria L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?