Paasch v. B&B Cargo, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Glen Paasch
Defendant: B&B Cargo, Inc., Gurjit Singh, Total Quality Logistics, LLC, John Doe and The Ziegenfelder Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv02551
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Referring Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant B&B Cargo, Inc... (Zickrick, Korissa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant B&B Cargo, Inc.. (Zickrick, Korissa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 B&B Cargo, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by B&B Cargo, Inc..(Zickrick, Korissa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Korissa M. Zickrick for Defendant B&B Cargo, Inc.. (Zickrick, Korissa)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Ted L. Perryman for Defendant B&B Cargo, Inc.. (Perryman, Ted)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Total Quality Logistics, LLC's motion to consolidate Paasch v. B&B Cargo, et al., No. 4:19- cv-02551-SRC, with the instant case (Doc. No. 72 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Case No. 4:19-cv-02551-SRC shall be consolidated under Consolidated Case No. 4:17-cv-02720-JAR. All future documents shall be filed in Consolidated Case No. 4:17-cv-02720-JAR. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before October 17, 2019, the parties shall file a proposed amended scheduling plan for this consolidated action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Total Quality Logistics, LLC's motion to compel is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff Justine Thompson shall provide responses to Defendant Total Quality Logistics, LLC's discovery on or before October 21, 2019. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/10/2019. (CLO)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing of Motion to consolidated by Defendant Total Quality Logistics, LLC with case number 17-cv-02720 (Attachments: #1 Attachment Motion to Consolidate, #2 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Motion to Consolidate)(Swift, Joseph)
October 3, 2019 Filing 8 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Clark for all further proceedings (KJS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Total Quality Logistics, LLC. Parent companies: N/A, Subsidiaries: N/A, Publicly held company: N/A,. (Swift, Joseph)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 17-cv-2720 filed by Defendant Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (Swift, Joseph)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Consolidate with higher case number 17-cv-2720 by Defendant Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Paasch Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Uhrhans Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Thompson Complaint, #4 Exhibit D Order to Consolidate)(Swift, Joseph)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Total Quality Logistics, LLC.(Swift, Joseph)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph R. Swift for Defendant Total Quality Logistics, LLC. (Swift, Joseph)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued 4. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Nannette A. Baker. (MFG)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7458161, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Glen Paasch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet Attorney Attachment, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #4 Waiver of Service Waiver of Summons - B&B Cargo, Inc., #5 Waiver of Service Waiver of Summons - Gurjit Singh, #6 Waiver of Service Waiver of Summons - The Ziegenfelder Company, #7 Waiver of Service Waiver of Summons - Total Quality Logistics, LLC, #8 Letter Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons - B&B Cargo, Inc., #9 Letter Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons - Gurjit Singh, #10 Letter Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons - The Ziegenfelder Company, #11 Letter Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons - Total Quality Logistics, LLC)(Grayson, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paasch v. B&B Cargo, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Paasch
Represented By: Adam Grayson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&B Cargo, Inc.
Represented By: Ted L. Perryman
Represented By: Korissa M. Zickrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurjit Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Quality Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Joseph R. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ziegenfelder Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?