Crepps v. Conopco, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dan Crepps
Defendant: Does 1 - 10 and Conopco, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02553
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: As noticed by plaintiff, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/21/19. (CDP)
October 19, 2019 Filing 11 FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dan Crepps WITHOUT PREJUDICE (Harvath, Daniel)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time: ORDERED GRANTED; deadline for responsive pleading or motion is extended to 10/28/19; if motion is filed any brief in opposition is due no later than 12/2/19; reply brief is due no later than 12/23/19. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 9/17/19. (CDP)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) and Entry of Briefing Schedule by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). The above styled and numbered case was removed on September 13, 2019. Due to a clerical error, this case was assigned to the Honorable Jean C. Hamilton, United States District Judge and must be reassigned. Accordingly, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-styled cause is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Catherine D. Perry, United States District Judge. Dated this 13th Day of September 2019 (MFG)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Jefferson County, filed by Dan Crepps.(MFG)
September 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (MFG)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of Jefferson County, filed by Dan Crepps.(MFG) (Main Document 5 replaced on 9/13/2019) (MFG).
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Acknowledgment)(Muehlberger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. Parent companies: Unilever United States, Inc., Subsidiaries: Trumbull Research Services, Inc., Sundial Brands, LLC, Publicly held company: Unilever PLC, Unilever NV,. (Muehlberger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Muehlberger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd Judicial Circuit - Jefferson, case number 19JE-CC00488, with receipt number AMOEDC-7458386, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Conopco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muehlberger, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crepps v. Conopco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc.
Represented By: James Muehlberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Crepps
Represented By: Daniel F. Harvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?