Richards v. Conopco, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jamie Richards
Defendant: Does 1 - 10 and Conopco, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02556
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Referring Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion to Consolidate Case for Pre-Trial Proceedings: by Defendant Conopco, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion and Memorandum of Support)(Muehlberger, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings. (TMT)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Extension of Time and Entry of Briefing Schedule (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Conopco, Inc. shall file its Motion to Dismiss on or before October 28, 2019, Plaintiff shall file his response to the Motion to Dismiss on or before December 2, 2019, and Defendant Conopco, Inc. shall file its reply on or before December 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 09/20/2019. (KBL)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) and Entry of Briefing Schedule by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. (Muehlberger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. (BAK)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Jamie Richards.(BAK)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Acknowledgment)(Muehlberger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Conopco, Inc.. Parent companies: Unilever United States, Inc., Subsidiaries: Trumbull Research Services, Inc., Sundial Brands, LLC, Publicly held company: Unilever PLC, Unilever NV,. (Muehlberger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Conopco, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Muehlberger, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 22nd Judical Circuit - City of St. Louis, case number 1922-CC10862, with receipt number AMOEDC-7458762, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Conopco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Muehlberger, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards v. Conopco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conopco, Inc.
Represented By: James Muehlberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Richards
Represented By: Daniel F. Harvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?