Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO et al v. Landgraf & Son, LLC
Plaintiff: Local Union 513 Pension Fund, Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Timothy J. Sappington and Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund
Defendant: Landgraf & Son, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02565
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #7 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Landgraf & Son by Plaintiffs Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Local Union 513 Pension Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Timothy J. Sappington, Timothy J. Sappington. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Faul, James) filed by Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Timothy J. Sappington, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Local Union 513 Pension Fund, Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO ; ORDERED DENIED AS MOOT.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 11/04/2019. (AAS)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 MOTION TO FILE ANSWER OUT OF TIME by Defendant Landgraf & Son, LLC. (AAS) filed by Landgraf & Son, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 11/04/2019. (AAS)
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO FILE ANSWER OUT OF TIME by Defendant Landgraf & Son, LLC. (AAS)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 DEFENDANTS ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint,,, by Landgraf & Son, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion to File Answer Out of Time)(Rau, Daniel)
October 25, 2019 ***REMARK Motion for Clerks Default #7 was forwarded to the Clerk of Court/Chief Deputy for ruling. (AAS)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against Landgraf & Son by Plaintiffs Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Local Union 513 Pension Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Timothy J. Sappington, Timothy J. Sappington. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Faul, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Pension Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Timothy J. Sappington(in his Representative Capacity as President and Business Manager), Timothy J. Sappington(in his Capacity as Chairman of the Board of Trustees of Said Funds), Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund. All Defendants. (Faul, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Landgraf & Son, LLC Amendment to #1 Complaint,,, filed by Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Pension Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Timothy J. Sappington(in his Representative Capacity as President and Business Manager), Timothy J. Sappington(in his Capacity as Chairman of the Board of Trustees of Said Funds), Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund. Related document: #1 Complaint,, filed by Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Timothy J. Sappington, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Local Union 513 Pension Fund, Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO.(JMP)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #3 MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Plaintiffs Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Local Union 513 Pension Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Timothy J. Sappington, Timothy J. Sappington. . (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Amended Complaint)(Faul, James) Modified on 9/30/2019 (AAS). filed by Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Timothy J. Sappington, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Local Union 513 Pension Fund, Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO ; GRANTED.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 9/30/2019. (JMP)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Plaintiffs Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Local Union 513 Pension Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Timothy J. Sappington, Timothy J. Sappington. . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Complaint)(Faul, James) Modified on 9/30/2019 (AAS).
September 13, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney James P. Faul. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Jean C. Hamilton. (BAK)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Local Union 513 Pension Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund, Timothy J. Sappington, Timothy J. Sappington Process Server: Cape Girardeau County Sheriff (Faul, James)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7459985, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Local Union 513 Annuity Fund, Local Union 513 Pension Fund, Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund, Timothy J. Sappington(Plaintiff), Timothy J. Sappington(Chairman of the Board of Trustees of Plaintiff Funds), Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO, Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund, Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons)(Faul, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO et al v. Landgraf & Son, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union 513 Pension Fund
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union 513 Annuity Fund
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union 513 Supplemental Vacation Fund
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 513, International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union 513 Joint Apprenticeship Training Fund
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J. Sappington
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Union 513 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: James P. Faul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landgraf & Son, LLC
Represented By: Daniel H. Rau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?