Painters District Council No. 58 et al v. Tidwell Brothers Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: Joseph Mueller, Walter Bazan, Jr., Kyle Lopez, Donald Thomas, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Gregg Smith, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Dane McGraw, Richard Lucks, Michael Smith, David Doerr, Tim Weis, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust, Carl Farrell, Mark Borgmann, Painters District Council No. 58, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Daniel Wienstroer and Joseph Keipp
Defendant: Adam Tidwell, Justin Tidwell, NAT Construction, LLC, Tidwell Brothers Construction, LLC and Rick Tidwell
Case Number: 4:2019cv02570
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Karl W. Dickhaus of Gusdorf Law Firm, LLC ;substituted for:Bryon E. Hale of Barklage, Brett & Hamill, P.C. by Defendant Adam Tidwell. (Hale, Bryon) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/1/19. (JAB)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Karl W. Dickhaus of Gusdorf Law Firm, LLC ;substituted for:Bryon E. Hale of Barklage, Brett & Hamill, P.C. by Defendant Adam Tidwell. (Hale, Bryon)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Docket Text ORDER: as to Adam Tidwell, Justin Tidwell, Rick Tidwell, Tidwell Brothers Construction, LLC Re: #8 MOTION for Extension of Time ; ENTRY of Appearance by Karl W. Dickhaus for Defendants Adam Tidwell, Justin Tidwell, Rick Tidwell, Tidwell Brothers Construction, LLC. (Dickhaus, Karl) ; ORDERED GRANTED, (Adam Tidwell answer due 11/27/2019; Justin Tidwell answer due 11/20/2019; Rick Tidwell answer due 11/27/2019; Tidwell Brothers Construction, LLC answer due 11/27/2019.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/29/2019. (CLO)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time ; ENTRY of Appearance by Karl W. Dickhaus for Defendants Adam Tidwell, Justin Tidwell, Rick Tidwell, Tidwell Brothers Construction, LLC. (Dickhaus, Karl) (Main Document 8 replaced on 10/28/2019) (CLO). Modified to add motion event on 10/28/2019 (CLO).
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Carl Farrell, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith(in his capacity as Business Manager of Painters District Council NO. 58), Mark Borgmann, Painters District Council No. 58, Joseph Keipp, Daniel Wienstroer, Kyle Lopez, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Richard Lucks, Donald Thomas, Walter Bazan, Jr., Dane McGraw, Michael Smith, David Doerr, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Tim Weis, Joseph Mueller, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust. Adam Tidwell served on 10/5/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Gierse, Matthew)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Carl Farrell, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith(in his capacity as Business Manager of Painters District Council NO. 58), Mark Borgmann, Painters District Council No. 58, Joseph Keipp, Daniel Wienstroer, Kyle Lopez, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Richard Lucks, Donald Thomas, Walter Bazan, Jr., Dane McGraw, Michael Smith, David Doerr, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Tim Weis, Joseph Mueller, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust. Tidwell Brothers Construction, LLC served on 10/5/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Gierse, Matthew)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Carl Farrell, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith(in his capacity as Business Manager of Painters District Council NO. 58), Mark Borgmann, Painters District Council No. 58, Joseph Keipp, Daniel Wienstroer, Kyle Lopez, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Richard Lucks, Donald Thomas, Walter Bazan, Jr., Dane McGraw, Michael Smith, David Doerr, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Tim Weis, Joseph Mueller, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust. Rick Tidwell served on 10/5/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Gierse, Matthew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Carl Farrell, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith(in his capacity as Business Manager of Painters District Council NO. 58), Mark Borgmann, Painters District Council No. 58, Joseph Keipp, Daniel Wienstroer, Kyle Lopez, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Richard Lucks, Donald Thomas, Walter Bazan, Jr., Dane McGraw, Michael Smith, David Doerr, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Tim Weis, Joseph Mueller, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust. Justin Tidwell served on 9/28/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Gierse, Matthew)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Carl Farrell, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith(in his capacity as Business Manager of Painters District Council NO. 58), Mark Borgmann, Painters District Council No. 58, Joseph Keipp, Daniel Wienstroer, Kyle Lopez, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Richard Lucks, Donald Thomas, Walter Bazan, Jr., Dane McGraw, Michael Smith, David Doerr, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Tim Weis, Joseph Mueller, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust. NAT Construction, LLC served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Gierse, Matthew)
September 16, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 5 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Matthew J. Gierse. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable John A. Ross. (MFG)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Walter Bazan, Jr., Mark Borgmann, David Doerr, Carl Farrell, Joseph Keipp, Kyle Lopez, Richard Lucks, Zane McGraw, Joseph Mueller, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters District Council No. 58, Gregg Smith, Gregg Smith, Michael Smith, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Donald Thomas, Tim Weis, Daniel Wienstroer Process Server: Frederick Investigations (Gierse, Matthew)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7462068, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Carl Farrell, Gregg Smith(Plaintiff Trustee), Gregg Smith(Plaintiff), Mark Borgmann, Painters District Council No. 58, Joseph Keipp, Daniel Wienstroer, Kyle Lopez, Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, St. Louis Painters Pension Trust, Richard Lucks, Donald Thomas, Walter Bazan, Jr., Zane McGraw, Michael Smith, David Doerr, St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust, Tim Weis, Joseph Mueller, St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons - Adam Tidwell, #4 Summons Summons - Justin Tidwell, #5 Summons Summons - Rick Tidwell, #6 Summons Summons - NAT Construction, LLC, d/b/a Tidwell Brothers Construction, #7 Summons Summons - Tidwell Brothers Construction, LLC)(Gierse, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Painters District Council No. 58 et al v. Tidwell Brothers Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mueller
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Bazan, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Lopez
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Thomas
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Painters Pension Trust
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregg Smith
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Painters Welfare Trust
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dane McGraw
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Lucks
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Doerr
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Weis
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Painters Vacation Trust
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Farrell
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Borgmann
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters District Council No. 58
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters District Council No. 2 Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Wienstroer
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Keipp
Represented By: Matthew J. Gierse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Tidwell
Represented By: Karl W. Dickhaus
Represented By: Bryon Earl Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Tidwell
Represented By: Karl W. Dickhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAT Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidwell Brothers Construction, LLC
Represented By: Karl W. Dickhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Tidwell
Represented By: Karl W. Dickhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?