Hall v. The City of St. Louis, Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Luther Hall
Defendant: Lawrence O'Toole, Lyda Krewson, Randy Hays, Dustin Boone, Bailey Colletta, Christopher Myers, Steven Korte, The City of St. Louis, Missouri, Joseph Marcantano, John and Jane Doe and Jaimie Pitterle
Case Number: 4:2019cv02579
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael W. Flynn for Defendant Bailey Colletta. (Flynn, Michael)
November 14, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by John A. Kilo for Defendant Bailey Colletta. (Kilo, John)
November 3, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Lyda Krewson. (Dierker, Robert)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luther Hall Bailey Colletta waiver signed on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Petruska, Lynette)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, official capacity allegations filed by Plaintiff Luther Hall. (Petruska, Lynette)
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Luther Hall. (Petruska, Lynette)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Megan Kathleen G Bruyns for Defendants Lyda Krewson, Lawrence O'Toole, The City of St. Louis, Missouri. (Bruyns, Megan)
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Lyda Krewson. (Dierker, Robert)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Lyda Krewson. (Dierker, Robert)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, official capacity allegations filed by Defendants Lyda Krewson, Lawrence O'Toole, The City of St. Louis, Missouri. (Dierker, Robert)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, official capacity allegations by Defendants Lyda Krewson, Lawrence O'Toole, The City of St. Louis, Missouri. (Dierker, Robert)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert H. Dierker for Defendants Lyda Krewson, Lawrence O'Toole, The City of St. Louis, Missouri. (Dierker, Robert)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luther Hall Lyda Krewson waiver signed on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Petruska, Lynette)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Luther Hall The City of St. Louis, Missouri waiver signed on 9/19/2019, answer due 11/18/2019. (Petruska, Lynette)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Jean C. Hamilton for all further proceedings (KKS)
October 8, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Luther Hall to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by C. John Pleban for Plaintiff Luther Hall. (Pleban, C.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by J. C. Pleban for Plaintiff Luther Hall. (Pleban, J.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Dismissal of Defendant Jaimie Pitterle: by Plaintiff Luther Hall (Petruska, Lynette)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 17, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Waivers issued: 21. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. (BAK)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-7463475, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Luther Hall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Waiver of Service)(Petruska, Lynette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. The City of St. Louis, Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence O'Toole
Represented By: Megan Kathleen G Bruyns
Represented By: Robert H. Dierker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyda Krewson
Represented By: Megan Kathleen G Bruyns
Represented By: Robert H. Dierker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bailey Colletta
Represented By: Michael W. Flynn
Represented By: John A. Kilo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Korte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of St. Louis, Missouri
Represented By: Megan Kathleen G Bruyns
Represented By: Robert H. Dierker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Marcantano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaimie Pitterle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Hall
Represented By: Lynette M. Petruska
Represented By: J. C. Pleban
Represented By: C. John Pleban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?