Speed v. Aqua Finance Inc
Plaintiff: Danielle M. Speed
Defendant: Aqua Finance Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv02584
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aqua Finance Inc.(Strickler, Stephanie)
November 9, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephanie Anne Strickler for Defendant Aqua Finance Inc. (Strickler, Stephanie)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Danielle M. Speed. Aqua Finance Inc served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (CSG)
October 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant Aqua Finance Inc. The summons was hand delivered to plaintiff for service. (CSG)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Danielle M. Speed Process Server: Marathon County Sheriff. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(CSG)
September 27, 2019 Receipt 4644082840 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of Danielle Speed (CCAM)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Mailed to non-electronic party this date. Fri Sep 20 11:19:45 CDT 2019 (Cordray, Abby)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send to plaintiff a copy of the Court's motion to proceed in forma pauperis form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, plaintiff must either file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the entire filing fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. (Response to Court due by 10/11/2019.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs)(AFC)
September 17, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Sep 17 09:00:48 CDT 2019 (admin,)
September 17, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
September 17, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (JWD)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Aqua Finance Inc, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Danielle M. Speed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JWD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2019: #2 Envelope) (JWD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speed v. Aqua Finance Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle M. Speed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aqua Finance Inc
Represented By: Stephanie Anne Strickler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?