Ransom v. Gilmore Law Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Gilmore Law Group, LLC and Christine D. Ransom
Case Number: 4:2019cv02594
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Christine Ransom. Gilmore Law Group, LLC served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Brody, Bryan)
September 18, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Bryan E. Brody. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (MFG)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Christine Ransom Process Server: Rufus Harmon (MFG)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Gilmore Law Group, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7466924, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Christine D. Ransom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Notice of Intent to Use Process Server)(Brody, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ransom v. Gilmore Law Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilmore Law Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine D. Ransom
Represented By: Bryan E. Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?