Rue-Chapman v. Unimerica Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Diann S Rue-Chapman
Defendant: Unimerica Insurance Company and United Health Care Specialty Benefits LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02620
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants Unimerica Insurance Company, United Health Care Specialty Benefits LLC. (Brodzik, James) filed by Unimerica Insurance Company, United Health Care Specialty Benefits LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/18/19. (MRS)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Unimerica Insurance Company, United Health Care Specialty Benefits LLC Amendment to #1 Complaint,, filed by Diann S. Rue-Chapman. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Diann S. Rue-Chapman.(MRS)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #9 First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Diann S. Rue-Chapman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Olszeski, Adam) filed by Diann S. Rue-Chapman ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/18/19. (MRS)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants Unimerica Insurance Company, United Health Care Specialty Benefits LLC. (Brodzik, James)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Diann S. Rue-Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(Olszeski, Adam)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Unimerica Insurance Company, United Health Care Specialty Benefits LLC. (Brodzik, James) filed by Unimerica Insurance Company, United Health Care Specialty Benefits LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/22/19. ANSWER DUE - 11/22/19(MRS)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). To avoid any potential appearance of impropriety, Judge Stephen R. Clark disqualifies himself from this case. Therefore, the case is being randomly reassigned to a different Judge. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is reassigned to the Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. (KXS)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K. Ryan for Defendants Unimerica Insurance Company, United Health Care Specialty Benefits LLC. (Ryan, Daniel)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Unimerica Insurance Company, United Health Care Specialty Benefits LLC. (Brodzik, James)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by James M. Brodzik for Defendants Unimerica Insurance Company, United Health Care Specialty Benefits LLC. (Brodzik, James)
September 26, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 2 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Adam James Olszeski. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (JWD)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Diann S. Rue-Chapman Process Server: St. Louis County Sheriff (Attachments: #1 Summons United Healthcare)(JWD)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Diann S. Rue-Chapman Process Server: Cole County Sheriff (Attachments: #1 Summons Unimerica)(JWD) .
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Unimerica Insurance Company, United Health Care Specialty Benefits LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7478016, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Diann S Rue-Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Initial Filing Documents)(Olszeski, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rue-Chapman v. Unimerica Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unimerica Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Health Care Specialty Benefits LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diann S Rue-Chapman
Represented By: Adam James Olszeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?