Tucker v. BL Restaurant Operations, LLC
Plaintiff: Carl Tucker
Defendant: BL Restaurant Operations, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02625
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen N Limbaugh
Referring Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: The Court having been advised by counsel that this action has been settled, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pending motions are denied without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel shall file, within sixty (60) days of the date of this order, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. Dismissal Paper(s) due by 1/21/2020. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/19/19. (CSG)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Rule 16 Conference reset for 11/18/2019 02:15 PM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Counsel participating in the conference shall call the Court's conference call phone number: 1-866-434-5269, access code, 2082948.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/25/19. (MRS)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #16 MOTION to Continue November 8, 2019 Rule 16 Conference by Defendant BL Restaurant Operations, LLC. (Ryan, Andrew) filed by BL Restaurant Operations, LLC ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/25/19. (CMH)
October 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Continue November 8, 2019 Rule 16 Conference by Defendant BL Restaurant Operations, LLC. (Ryan, Andrew)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 16 Conference re-set for 11/8/2019 11:00 AM by Telephone before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/16/19. (CSG)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant BL Restaurant Operations, LLC. (PROPOSED). (Ryan, Andrew)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Hayley Corrine Bohnert for Defendant BL Restaurant Operations, LLC. (Bohnert, Hayley)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 CJRA ORDER (GJL). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah to District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr.. (ARL)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant BL Restaurant Operations, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Ryan, Andrew)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: This case is assigned to Track: 2. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/31/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 11/7/2019 03:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shirley Padmore Mensah on 9/25/19. (KEK)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 THIS DOCUMENT WAS FILED ON CLERKS ERROR.
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
September 24, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Shirley P. Mensah. (BAK)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Letter to attorney Thomas Traube from Clerk Re:Admission to the Bar (BAK)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, City of St. Louis, filed by Carl Tucker.(BAK)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by BL Restaurant Operations, LLC.(Ryan, Andrew)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew D. Ryan for Defendant BL Restaurant Operations, LLC. (Ryan, Andrew)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant BL Restaurant Operations, LLC. (Ryan, Andrew)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant BL Restaurant Operations, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Ryan, Andrew)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CITY OF ST. LOUIS, case number 1922-CC11135, with receipt number AMOEDC-7479250, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by BL Restaurant Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ryan, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. BL Restaurant Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Tucker
Represented By: Thomas P. Traube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BL Restaurant Operations, LLC
Represented By: Andrew D. Ryan
Represented By: Hayley Corrine Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?