Gaia v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Zinaya Gaia
Defendant: St. Peters Police Department, Judge Joel David Brett, St. Charles County Police Department, State of Missouri, St. Charles County Court House, United States of America, Maryland Heights Police Department, Donald L Kohl and MO State Hwy Patrol
Case Number: 4:2019cv02670
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Jean C Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Zinaya Gaia. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(MCB)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Zinaya Gaia. (KJS)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Zinaya Gaia. Returned document(s): Complaint Letter Processed. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (KJS)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Zinaya Gaia. (KJS)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff an Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must either pay the $400 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed without prepaying fees or costs within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice. (cc: mail a 'Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs form.). Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 10/1/2019. (JMP)
September 30, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Sep 30 16:04:03 CDT 2019 (admin,)
September 30, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
September 30, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. (JWD)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Zinaya Gaia. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Negative Averment, #2 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaia v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Peters Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Joel David Brett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County Court House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Heights Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald L Kohl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MO State Hwy Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zinaya Gaia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?