Baalim v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Malak Baalim
Defendant: St. Peters Police Department, Joel David Brett, State of Missouri, United States of America, St. Charles County Municipal Court, St. Charles County and MO State Hwy Patrol
Case Number: 4:2019cv02671
Filed: September 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Malak Baalim. (KJS)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Malak Baalim. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(EAB)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Malak Baalim. Returned document(s): Complaint Letter Created. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (KJS)
October 3, 2019 ***REMARK Mailed a copy of the Courts motion to proceed in forma pauperis form this day to plaintiff. (AAS)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Thu Oct 3 09:54:02 CDT 2019 (Shepard, Alicia)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall send to plaintiff a copy of the Courts motion to proceed in forma pauperis form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall either pay the full filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to respond to this order within twenty- one (21) days, this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice.. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 10/2/2019. (JMP)
September 30, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Sep 30 17:01:47 CDT 2019 (admin,)
September 30, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
September 30, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry E. Autrey. (JWD)
September 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Non-Jury Demand, filed by Malak Baalim. (Attachments: #1 Appostile - Affidavit of Obligation to Pay, #2 Envelope)(JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baalim v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Peters Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel David Brett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County Municipal Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MO State Hwy Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malak Baalim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?