Kerr v. MCU Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff: Sarah T. Kerr
Defendant: MCU Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02676
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on November 22, 2019. (BRP)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sarah T. Kerr (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Daher, Marwan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Sarah T. Kerr (Daher, Marwan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Sarah T. Kerr. MCU Holdings, LLC served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Daher, Marwan)
October 1, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Marwan Rocco Daher. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Alexander J. Taylor for Plaintiff Sarah T. Kerr. (Taylor, Alexander)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Sarah T. Kerr Process Server: Jose Pineiro (Daher, Marwan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant MCU Holdings, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7491866, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Sarah T. Kerr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Original Filing Form)(Daher, Marwan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerr v. MCU Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah T. Kerr
Represented By: Alexander J. Taylor
Represented By: Marwan Rocco Daher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCU Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?