O'Neill v. Sezgin
Plaintiff: Justin Simon O'Neill
Defendant: Deniz Meral Sezgin
Case Number: 4:2019cv02686
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David D Noce
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:11601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT JUDGMENT. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/26/2019. (CLO)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL Proposed Consent Judgment signed by the parties and submitted to the Court. (CLO)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce: Status Conference held on 11/8/2019. Discussion held re #12 Consent Decree. The parties submit a Supplemental Proposed Consent Judgment to be filed by the Court. (proceedings started: 11:56 am) (proceedings ended: 12:10 pm)(FTR Gold Operator initials: COlliges)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Jonathan D. Marks)(Appearance for Defendant: John D. Kershman) (CLO)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REGARDING NOVEMBER 8, 2019, HEARING: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that at the hearing set for Friday, November 8, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. the Court will take up the consent decree the parties have submitted to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/6/2019. (CLO)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 Consent Decree by Plaintiff Justin Simon O'Neill. (Marks, Jonathan)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on the motion of defendant to dismiss (Doc. 7) petitioner's verified complaint, is set for Friday, November 8, 2019, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 17N before Magistrate Judge David D. Noce. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 11/1/2019. (RTS)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Justin Simon O'Neill, Defendant Deniz Meral Sezgin. (JAB)
October 30, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant Deniz Meral Sezgin to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JAB)
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Deniz Meral Sezgin.(Kershman, John)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Deniz Meral Sezgin. (Kershman, John)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Deniz Meral Sezgin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Kershman, John)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Justin Simon O'Neill. Deniz Meral Sezgin served on 10/4/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. (Marks, Jonathan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by John D. Kershman for Defendant Deniz Meral Sezgin. (Kershman, John)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENTAL - Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Justin Simon O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form)(BAK)
October 2, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Jonathan D. Marks. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (JWD)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Justin Simon O'Neill Process Server: Dennis Dalhberg and/or Mary Dahlberg (JWD)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition for Return of Child Under the Hague Convention against defendant Deniz Meral Sezgin with receipt number AMOEDC-7494183, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Justin Simon O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action)(Marks, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neill v. Sezgin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deniz Meral Sezgin
Represented By: John D. Kershman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Simon O'Neill
Represented By: Jonathan D. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?