Nekouee v. HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Defendant: HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02735
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nannette A Baker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED with prejudice with each party to bear their own costs.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 11/27/2019. (AAS)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fred Nekouee (Vincze, Robert)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fred Nekouee (Vincze, Robert)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment no later than December 9, 2019. Failure to timely comply with this Order shall result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all existing deadlines are stayed pending compliance with this order. Dismissal Paper(s) due by 12/9/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 11/19/2019. (AAS)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Fred Nekouee (Vincze, Robert)
November 6, 2019 Notice from Clerk instructing to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/13/2019. (AAS)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee. (Vincze, Robert) filed by Fred Nekouee is ORDERED GRANTED. Defendant shall have up to and including November 20, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on November 1, 2019. (HEH)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee. (Vincze, Robert)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Fred Nekouee. HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (Vincze, Robert)
October 9, 2019 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Robert Joseph Vincze. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker. (BAK)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Fred Nekouee Process Server: Eastern Missouri (Vincze, Robert)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-7509127, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Fred Nekouee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC)(Vincze, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nekouee v. HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Nekouee
Represented By: Robert Joseph Vincze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOA Restaurant Holder, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?