Cox v. Dewly
Plaintiff: Willie Cox, Jr.
Defendant: Joseph Dewly
Case Number: 4:2019cv02744
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Notification from USCA for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Willie Cox, Jr. USCA Appeal Number: 19-3556(JAB)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of USCA as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Willie Cox, Jr: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 12/30/2019, this appeal may be dismissed for failure to prosecute without further notice. USCA Appeal #: 19-3556 (JAB)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL AND NOA SUPPLEMENT by clerk to USCA regarding #3 Memorandum & Order, #4 Order of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(b),. Notice of Appeal filed on 11/26/2019 by Plaintiff Willie Cox, Jr. NOTIFICATION TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTY: FILE REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT WITH DISTRICT COURT CLERKS OFFICE.(MFG)
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Memorandum & Order, #4 Order of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(b), by Plaintiff Willie Cox, Jr. (CLO)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3, 4. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Fri Nov 22 10:49:47 CST 2019 (Olliges, Chelsea)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/21/2019. (CLO)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. [ECF No. #2 ] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. A separate order of dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/21/2019. (CLO)
October 10, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Oct 10 10:01:03 CDT 2019 (admin,)
October 10, 2019 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (BAK)
October 10, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Willie Cox, Jr. (BAK)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Joseph Dewly Jury Demand,, filed by Willie Cox, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Dewly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Dewly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Cox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?