Blake v. St. Charles Community College
Plaintiff: Diane Blake
Defendant: St. Charles Community College
Case Number: 4:2019cv02745
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is set for December 17, 2019, at 11:00 AM in the chambers and/or by telephone of the undersigned. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/10/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/17/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge John A. Ross. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/1/19. (JAB)
October 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Petition by St. Charles Community College.(Moutray, Mandi)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant St. Charles Community College Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Attachment Acknowledgment of State Court Clerk)(Moutray, Mandi)
October 10, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Charles County, Missouri, filed by Diane Blake.(BAK)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Notice of Removal Petition, Amended Petition and Entry of Appearance in State Court matter for Ben Westhoff by Defendant St. Charles Community College. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Entry of Appearance in State Court Matter for Ben WeshoffBen)(Moutray, Mandi)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Charles County, Missouri, filed by Diane Blake.(BAK)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Melanie Gurley Keeney for Defendant St. Charles Community College. (Keeney, Melanie)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant St. Charles Community College Sent To: Plaintiff (Moutray, Mandi)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Charles County Circuit Court, case number 1911-CC00855, with receipt number AMOEDC-7512701, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by St. Charles Community College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court File, #2 Exhibit B- Notice to State Court Clerk, #3 Original Filing Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moutray, Mandi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blake v. St. Charles Community College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Charles Community College
Represented By: Mandi Diane Moutray
Represented By: Melanie Gurley Keeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Blake
Represented By: Benjamin F. Westhoff
Represented By: Jessica M. Scales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?