Bledsoe v. Midland Funding LLC
Plaintiff: Terry Bledsoe
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv02779
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Referring Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2; Motion to Join Parties due by 3/27/2020. Discovery Completion due by 5/22/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/10/2020. Jury Trial set for 12/14/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12N - St. Louis before District Judge John A. Ross.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/2/19. (KKS) Modified text on 12/3/2019 (JAB).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED by agreement of the parties that the Rule 16 Conference scheduled for December 4, 2019 is CANCELLED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to attend the Rule 16 Conference by telephone #12 is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/2/19. (JAB)
November 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to ATTEND RULE 16 CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE by Plaintiff Terry Bledsoe. (Cook, Matthew)
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Terry Bledsoe. . (Cook, Matthew)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge John A. Ross for all further proceedings (AFC)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 11/27/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/4/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 11/13/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 10/24/2019. (AFC)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Shilee T. Mullin for Defendant Midland Funding LLC. (Mullin, Shilee)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint #4 by Midland Funding LLC.(Dickinson, Joshua)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Midland Funding LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Dickinson, Joshua)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW)
October 16, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen. (BAK)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Terry Bledsoe.(BAK)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Midland Funding LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Dickinson, Joshua)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Midland Funding LLC. Parent companies: Encore Capital Group, Inc., Publicly held company: Encore Capital Group, Inc.,. (Dickinson, Joshua)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, case number 19SL-AC25608, with receipt number AMOEDC-7521731, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Midland Funding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - State Court Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Dickinson, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bledsoe v. Midland Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Joshua C. Dickinson
Represented By: Shilee T. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Bledsoe
Represented By: Matthew P. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?