Kreutz v. Greif Ruvinof Dental Care, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Kreutz
Defendant: Florissant Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC, The Hills Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC, Belleville Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC, Greif Ruvinof Dental Care, LLC d/b/a Brookside Family Dentistry, Kingston Dental Center - Ronald K. Greif D.D.S., P.C., Greif Ruvinof Dental Care, LLC and Belleville Dental Care-Ronald Greif, D.D.S and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., P.C.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02794
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/12/2019. (KXS)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply:1.Scheduling Conference: A Scheduling Conference, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16,is set for Thursday, January 9, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. in the chambers of Judge Stephen R. Clark. Lead trial counsel must appear for the conference in-person.(SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/30/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/9/2020 10:30 AM in Chambers before District Judge Stephen R. Clark.). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/3/2019. (CLO)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Johnson for Defendants Belleville Dental Care-Ronald Greif, D.D.S and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., P.C., Florissant Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC, Greif Ruvinof Dental Care, LLC, Kingston Dental Center - Ronald K. Greif D.D.S., P.C., The Hills Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC. (Johnson, Elizabeth)
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Belleville Dental Care-Ronald Greif, D.D.S and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., P.C., Florissant Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC, Greif Ruvinof Dental Care, LLC, Kingston Dental Center - Ronald K. Greif D.D.S., P.C., The Hills Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC.(Ricks, Fred)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Fred A. Ricks, Jr for Defendants Belleville Dental Care-Ronald Greif, D.D.S and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., P.C., Florissant Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC, Greif Ruvinof Dental Care, LLC, Kingston Dental Center - Ronald K. Greif D.D.S., P.C., The Hills Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC. (Ricks, Fred)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants must file an amended answer that complies with the undersigned's Judges Requirements by no later than Monday, October 28, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #10 Defendants' Answer is stricken for failure to comply with the undersigned's Judge's Requirements. Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 10/25/19. (JAB)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 (STRICKIN PER DOC #11) ANSWER to Complaint by Belleville Dental Care-Ronald Greif, D.D.S and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., P.C., Florissant Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC, Greif Ruvinof Dental Care, LLC, Kingston Dental Center - Ronald K. Greif D.D.S., P.C., The Hills Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC.(Ricks, Fred) Modified on 10/25/2019 (JAB).
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Greif Ruvinof Dental Care, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Ricks, Fred)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant The Hills Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Ricks, Fred)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Florissant Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Ricks, Fred)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Kingston Dental Center - Ronald K. Greif D.D.S., P.C.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Ricks, Fred)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Belleville Dental Care-Ronald Greif, D.D.S and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., P.C.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Ricks, Fred)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Belleville Dental Care-Ronald Greif, D.D.S and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., P.C., Florissant Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC, Greif Ruvinof Dental Care, LLC, Kingston Dental Center - Ronald K. Greif D.D.S., P.C., The Hills Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Ricks, Fred)
October 21, 2019 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. (MFG)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Belleville Dental Care-Ronald Greif, D.D.S and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., P.C., Florissant Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC, Greif Ruvinof Dental Care, LLC, Kingston Dental Center - Ronald K. Greif D.D.S., P.C., The Hills Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (MFG)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Charles County, filed by Elizabeth Kreutz.(MFG)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 11th Judicial Circuit, St. Charles County, MO, case number 1911-CC00891, with receipt number AMOEDC-7526263, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Florissant Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC, Belleville Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC, Kingston Dental Center - Ronald K. Greif D.D.S., P.C., Greif Ruvinof Dental Care, LLC d/b/a Brookside Family Dentistry, The Hills Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Pleadings St. Charles County Circuit Court, #4 Exhibit Docket sheet)(Ricks, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kreutz v. Greif Ruvinof Dental Care, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florissant Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC
Represented By: Fred A. Ricks, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hills Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S. and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC
Represented By: Fred A. Ricks, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belleville Dental Care - Ronald K. Greif, D.D.S and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., LLC
Represented By: Fred A. Ricks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greif Ruvinof Dental Care, LLC d/b/a Brookside Family Dentistry
Represented By: Fred A. Ricks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingston Dental Center - Ronald K. Greif D.D.S., P.C.
Represented By: Fred A. Ricks, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greif Ruvinof Dental Care, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Johnson
Represented By: Fred A. Ricks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belleville Dental Care-Ronald Greif, D.D.S and Samir Ruvinov, D.D.S., P.C.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Johnson
Represented By: Fred A. Ricks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Kreutz
Represented By: Kevin J. Kasper
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Schellert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?