Been v. Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carla Been
Defendant: Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv02836
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand by Defendant Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand)(Kaemmerer, Bryan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) Modified on 12/3/2019 (TMT).
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Carla Been. (Harvath, Daniel)
November 22, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES to MISSOURI STATE COURT filed by Plaintiff Carla Been. (Harvath, Daniel)
November 20, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES to MISSOURI STATE COURT filed by Defendant Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Stipulation for Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand [ECF No. 10] is GRANTED. Defendant shall file its memorandum in opposition to the motion to remand no later than November 20, 2019, and Plaintiff shall file her reply no later than December 13, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/12/19. (ALM)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Regarding the Parties' Briefing Schedule in Connection with Plaintiff's Motion for Remand by Defendant Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan) Modified on 11/7/2019 (TMT).
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael E. Kaemmerer for Defendant Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Michael)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading [ECF No. 4] is GRANTED to and including November 18, 2019. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/21/19. (ALM)
October 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES to MISSOURI STATE COURT by Plaintiff Carla Been. (Harvath, Daniel)
October 18, 2019 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Ronnie L. White. (BAK)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Carla Been.(BAK)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Petition by Defendant Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A)(Kaemmerer, Bryan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc.. Parent companies: none, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC03934, with receipt number AMOEDC-7528952, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complete State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet , #3 Original Filing Form , #4 Exhibit Declaration)(Kaemmerer, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Been v. Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Been
Represented By: Daniel F. Harvath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunshine Cleaners Plus, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan M. Kaemmerer
Represented By: Michael E. Kaemmerer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?